Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1522 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Shapleigh S.B. No. 1522
 (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2009; March 17, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; March 30, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0;
 March 30, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1522 By: Nichols


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the exemption of certain school districts from the
 drainage charge imposed by a municipal drainage utility system.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 552.053, Local Government Code, as
 effective April 1, 2009, is amended by adding Subsection (e) to read
 as follows:
 (e)  Property owned by a school district located wholly or
 partly in a municipality described by Section 552.044(8)(A) is
 exempt from drainage charges under Section 552.047 and all
 ordinances, resolutions, and rules adopted under this subchapter.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *