Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1522 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 1522


 AN ACT
 relating to the exemption of certain school districts from the
 drainage charge imposed by a municipal drainage utility system.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 552.053, Local Government Code, as
 effective April 1, 2009, is amended by adding Subsection (e) to read
 as follows:
 (e)  Property owned by a school district located wholly or
 partly in a municipality described by Section 552.044(8)(A) is
 exempt from drainage charges under Section 552.047 and all
 ordinances, resolutions, and rules adopted under this subchapter.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1522 passed the Senate on
 April 9, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1522 passed the House on
 May 26, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 145, Nays 0, one
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor