Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1526 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 1526


 AN ACT
 relating to the composition, administration, and duties, including
 reporting requirements, of the Border Health Institute.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (b), Section 151.002, Education Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (b) The institute shall operate in a manner that facilitates
 and assists the activities of international, national, regional, or
 local health-related institutions working in the Texas-Mexico
 border region [to:
 [(1)     create and fund centers or component units within
 the institute to facilitate research in fields of study affecting
 public health in the border region, including research related to
 diabetes, Hispanic health issues, infectious diseases, emerging
 infections, environmental health issues, and children's health
 issues;
 [(2)     deliver health care or provide health education
 to persons living in the border region; and
 [(3)     conduct and facilitate research in fields of
 study affecting public health in the border region, including
 research related to diabetes, Hispanic health issues, infectious
 diseases, emerging infections, environmental health issues, and
 children's health issues].
 SECTION 2. Subsection (a), Section 151.003, Education Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (a) Subject to Subsection (b), the [The] institute is
 [initially] composed of the following institutions:
 (1) The University of Texas at El Paso;
 (2) Texas Tech University Health Sciences Center at El
 Paso;
 (3) El Paso Community College District;
 (4) R. E. Thomason General Hospital;
 (5) El Paso City/County Health District;
 (6) Department of State Health Services; and
 (7) Medical Center of the Americas Foundation [The
 University of Texas Health Science Center at Houston, School of
 Public Health;
 [(7) El Paso County Medical Society;
 [(8) Paso del Norte Health Foundation; and
 [(9) the Texas Department of Health].
 SECTION 3. Section 151.008, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 151.008. BIENNIAL [ANNUAL] REPORTING. (a)  Not later
 than December 1 of each even-numbered [Each] year, each member of
 the institute shall provide a long-term strategic plan for that
 member to:
 (1) each member of the governing board of the
 institute;
 (2) [and to] each member of the legislature whose
 district includes any portion of a county where the Border Health
 Institute is established or operating; and
 (3) the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board [an
 annual audited financial statement and a status report of each
 project undertaken by the institute].
 (b)  The long-term strategic plan for each member must
 include a statement of the member's goals and objectives for:
 (1)  providing health care services to persons living
 in the border region;
 (2)  providing health care education to persons living
 in the border region; and
 (3)  conducting research into issues affecting public
 health in the border region, including research related to:
 (A) diabetes;
 (B)  health issues of particular concern to
 persons of Hispanic descent;
 (C) infectious diseases;
 (D) emerging infections;
 (E) trauma care;
 (F) environmental health; and
 (G) children's health.
 SECTION 4. Subsection (d), Section 151.004, and Sections
 151.006, 151.007, and 151.010, Education Code, are repealed.
 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1526 passed the Senate on
 April 2, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 29, 2009, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1526 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 26, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 145,
 Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor