Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1549 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Van de Putte S.B. No. 1549
 (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2009; March 17, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education; April 2, 2009,
 reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0;
 April 2, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the calculation by a school district of a high school
 student's grade point average.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (b), Section 28.0252, Education Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (b) If the commissioner develops a standard method under
 this section, a school district shall use the standard method to
 compute a student's high school grade point average[, except that
 to the extent of a conflict between that method and the method
 adopted under Section 51.807, the student's grade point average
 computed in accordance with the method established under Section
 51.807 shall be used in determining the student's eligibility for
 university admission under Subchapter U, Chapter 51].
 SECTION 2. Section 51.807, Education Code, as amended by
 Chapters 941 (H.B. 3826) and 1369 (H.B. 3851), Acts of the 80th
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2007, is reenacted to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 51.807. RULEMAKING. (a) The Texas Higher Education
 Coordinating Board may adopt rules relating to the operation of
 admissions programs under this subchapter, including rules
 relating to the identification of eligible students.
 (b) The Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board, after
 consulting with the Texas Education Agency, by rule shall establish
 standards for determining for purposes of this subchapter:
 (1) whether a private high school is accredited by a
 generally recognized accrediting organization; and
 (2) whether a person completed a high school
 curriculum that is equivalent in content and rigor to the
 curriculum requirements established under Section 28.025 for the
 recommended or advanced high school program.
 SECTION 3. To the extent of any conflict, this Act prevails
 over another Act of the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009,
 relating to nonsubstantive additions to and corrections in enacted
 codes.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *