Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1553 Senate Committee Report / Analysis

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    BILL ANALYSIS     Senate Research Center C.S.S.B. 1553  By: Wentworth  Jurisprudence  4/14/2009  Committee Report (Substituted)     AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT   Each session, the legislature routinely approves the creation of new district courts for counties that exhibit substantial judicial need. Several factors are analyzed in the evaluation process, including increased caseloads, case backlogs, substantial population growth, and county support. Measuring Current Judicial Workload in Texas, a research report issued by the Office of Court Administration in 2008, also provided valuable data regarding judicial need and was used in the analysis.    C.S.S.B. 1553 amends current law relating to the creation of district courts in certain counties.   RULEMAKING AUTHORITY   This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.   SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS   SECTION 1. (a) Amends Subchapter C, Chapter 24, Government Code, effective January 1, 2011, by adding Section 24.575, as follows:   Sec. 24.575. 431ST JUDICIAL DISTRICT (DENTON COUNTY). Provides that the 431st Judicial District is composed of Denton County.    (b) Provides that the 431st Judicial District is created on the effective date of this Act.    SECTION 2. (a) Amends Subchapter C, Chapter 24, Government Code, by adding Section 24.576, as follows:   Sec. 24.576. 432ND JUDICIAL DISTRICT (TARRANT COUNTY). (a) Provides that the 432nd Judicial District is composed of Tarrant County.    (b) Requires the 432nd District Court to give preference to criminal matters.   (b) Provides that the 432nd Judicial District is created on the effective date of this Act.   SECTION 3. (a) Amends Subchapter C, Chapter 24, Government Code, effective October 1, 2009, by adding Section 24.580, as follows:   Sec. 24.580. 436TH JUDICIAL DISTRICT (BEXAR COUNTY). (a) Provides that the 436th Judicial District is composed of Bexar county.   (b) Requires the 436th District Court to give preference to juvenile matters.   (b) Provides that the 436th Judicial District is created on October 1, 2009.   SECTION 4. Amends Subchapter C, Chapter 24, Government Code, effective January 1, 2010, by adding Section 24.581, as follows:   Sec. 24.581. 437TH JUDICIAL DISTRICT (BEXAR COUNTY). (a) Provides that the 437th Judicial District is composed of Bexar County.   (b) Requires the 437th Judicial District to give preference to criminal matters.    (b) Provides that the 437th Judicial District is created on January 1, 2010.    SECTION 5. (a) Amends Subchapter C, Chapter 24, Government Code, effective September 1, 2010, by adding Section 24.582, as follows:   Sec. 24.582. 438TH JUDICIAL DISTRICT (BEXAR COUNTY). (a) Provides that the 438th District Court is composed of Bexar County.   (b) Requires the 438th District court to give preference to civil matters.   (b) Provides that the 438th Judicial District is created on September 1, 2010.   SECTION 6. Effective date: September 1, 2009.  

BILL ANALYSIS

 

 

Senate Research Center C.S.S.B. 1553

 By: Wentworth

 Jurisprudence

 4/14/2009

 Committee Report (Substituted)

 

 

AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT

 

Each session, the legislature routinely approves the creation of new district courts for counties that exhibit substantial judicial need. Several factors are analyzed in the evaluation process, including increased caseloads, case backlogs, substantial population growth, and county support. Measuring Current Judicial Workload in Texas, a research report issued by the Office of Court Administration in 2008, also provided valuable data regarding judicial need and was used in the analysis. 

 

C.S.S.B. 1553 amends current law relating to the creation of district courts in certain counties.

 

RULEMAKING AUTHORITY

 

This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.

 

SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS

 

SECTION 1. (a) Amends Subchapter C, Chapter 24, Government Code, effective January 1, 2011, by adding Section 24.575, as follows:

 

Sec. 24.575. 431ST JUDICIAL DISTRICT (DENTON COUNTY). Provides that the 431st Judicial District is composed of Denton County. 

 

(b) Provides that the 431st Judicial District is created on the effective date of this Act. 

 

SECTION 2. (a) Amends Subchapter C, Chapter 24, Government Code, by adding Section 24.576, as follows:

 

Sec. 24.576. 432ND JUDICIAL DISTRICT (TARRANT COUNTY). (a) Provides that the 432nd Judicial District is composed of Tarrant County. 

 

(b) Requires the 432nd District Court to give preference to criminal matters.

 

(b) Provides that the 432nd Judicial District is created on the effective date of this Act.

 

SECTION 3. (a) Amends Subchapter C, Chapter 24, Government Code, effective October 1, 2009, by adding Section 24.580, as follows:

 

Sec. 24.580. 436TH JUDICIAL DISTRICT (BEXAR COUNTY). (a) Provides that the 436th Judicial District is composed of Bexar county.

 

(b) Requires the 436th District Court to give preference to juvenile matters.

 

(b) Provides that the 436th Judicial District is created on October 1, 2009.

 

SECTION 4. Amends Subchapter C, Chapter 24, Government Code, effective January 1, 2010, by adding Section 24.581, as follows:

 

Sec. 24.581. 437TH JUDICIAL DISTRICT (BEXAR COUNTY). (a) Provides that the 437th Judicial District is composed of Bexar County.

 

(b) Requires the 437th Judicial District to give preference to criminal matters. 

 

(b) Provides that the 437th Judicial District is created on January 1, 2010. 

 

SECTION 5. (a) Amends Subchapter C, Chapter 24, Government Code, effective September 1, 2010, by adding Section 24.582, as follows:

 

Sec. 24.582. 438TH JUDICIAL DISTRICT (BEXAR COUNTY). (a) Provides that the 438th District Court is composed of Bexar County.

 

(b) Requires the 438th District court to give preference to civil matters.

 

(b) Provides that the 438th Judicial District is created on September 1, 2010.

 

SECTION 6. Effective date: September 1, 2009.