Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1577 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Shapiro S.B. No. 1577
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2009; March 17, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education; April 8, 2009,
 reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0;
 April 8, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to excused absences from public school attendance for a
 student diagnosed with autism spectrum disorder to attend a health
 care appointment.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 25.087, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (b-3) to read as follows:
 (b-3)  A temporary absence for purposes of Subsection (b)(2)
 includes the temporary absence of a student diagnosed with autism
 spectrum disorder on the day of the student's appointment with a
 health care practitioner, as described by Section 1355.015(b),
 Insurance Code, to receive a generally recognized service for
 persons with autism spectrum disorder, including applied
 behavioral analysis, speech therapy, and occupational therapy.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *