Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1612 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Lucio S.B. No. 1612
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2009; March 17, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services;
 April 17, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 17, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1612 By: Deuell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the provision of information by health and human
 services agencies to assist children with velocardiofacial
 syndrome.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter D, Chapter 117, Human Resources Code,
 is amended by adding Section 117.076 to read as follows:
 Sec. 117.076.  INFORMATION REGARDING VELOCARDIOFACIAL
 SYNDROME. (a)  The commission shall ensure that each health and
 human services agency that provides intervention services to young
 children is provided with information developed by the commission
 regarding velocardiofacial syndrome.
 (b)  Each health and human services agency described by
 Subsection (a) shall provide the information regarding
 velocardiofacial syndrome to appropriate health care coordinators
 and therapists and to parents of a child who is known by the agency
 to have at least two of the following conditions:
 (1) hypotonicity;
 (2) communication delay;
 (3) articulation disorder;
 (4) resonance disorder;
 (5)  nasal regurgitation during feeding as an infant
 with no history of a cleft palate;
 (6)  recurrent ear infections as well as diagnosis of
 cardiac anomaly, feeding disorder, cleft palate, or submucosal
 cleft palate; or
 (7) fine motor or gross motor skills delay.
 (c)  The commission shall develop the information required
 under Subsection (a) using medically accurate, peer-reviewed
 literature.  The information must include:
 (1)  an explanation of velocardiofacial syndrome
 symptoms, diagnosis, and treatment options; and
 (2)  information on relevant state agency and nonprofit
 resources, parent support groups, and available Medicaid waiver
 programs.
 (d)  The executive commissioner may adopt rules as necessary
 to implement this section.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *