Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1619 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Wentworth S.B. No. 1619
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2009; March 17, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; April 6, 2009, reported favorably by the following
 vote: Yeas 4, Nays 0; April 6, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the applicability of certain municipal home-rule
 charter provisions on actions relating to the issuance of public
 securities by a home-rule municipality.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 1201.028, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 1201.028. SINGLE MEETING OF GOVERNING BODY SUFFICIENT.
 Notwithstanding any other law, including a provision in a municipal
 charter, the following actions taken at a meeting of the governing
 body of an issuer are effective immediately, without requirement of
 [and] a subsequent meeting, and are not subject to challenge by
 referendum [is not required]:
 (1) a resolution, order, or ordinance calling an
 election to:
 (A) authorize the issuance and sale of a public
 security; or
 (B) approve the resources, revenue, or income of
 the issuer that may be pledged as security for a public security;
 (2) a resolution, order, or ordinance canvassing the
 results of an election described by Subdivision (1); or
 (3) a public security authorization.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *