Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1626 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Wentworth S.B. No. 1626
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2009; March 20, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services;
 April 17, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 8,
 Nays 0; April 17, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the reporting of certain confidential statements made
 to a mental health professional.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 611.004, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (e) to read as follows:
 (e)  A professional to whom a patient communicates a threat
 of physical violence against a reasonably identifiable person shall
 report the threat to a local law enforcement agency if the
 professional determines in good faith that disclosure of the threat
 is necessary to protect the health or safety of a person. A
 professional who discloses confidential information in accordance
 with this subsection is immune from civil or criminal liability for
 that disclosure.
 SECTION 2. Title 1, Code of Criminal Procedure, is amended
 by adding Chapter 5A to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 5A. PREVENTION OF CERTAIN THREATENED PHYSICAL VIOLENCE
 Art. 5A.01.  REPORTS OF VIOLENT THREATS REQUIRED.  (a)  A
 peace officer who receives from a mental health professional a
 report of a threat of physical violence in accordance with Section
 611.004(e), Health and Safety Code, shall make a written report
 that includes:
 (1)  the names of the person making the threat, the
 person who is the reasonably identifiable target of the threat, and
 the mental health professional making the report; and
 (2) a description of the threat.
 (b)  A peace officer who receives from a mental health
 professional a report of a threat of physical violence in
 accordance with Section 611.004(e), Health and Safety Code, shall
 provide a copy of the report to:
 (1) the Department of State Health Services; and
 (2)  the bureau of identification and records of the
 Department of Public Safety of the State of Texas for the bureau's
 recordkeeping function under Section 411.042, Government Code.
 Art. 5A.02.  CERTAIN RECORDKEEPING REQUIRED. (a)  Each
 local law enforcement agency shall establish a departmental code
 for identifying and retrieving reports received under Article
 5A.01.
 (b)  In order to ensure that an officer investigating an
 incident or responding to a disturbance call that involves or may
 involve physical violence or threats of physical violence is aware
 of the existence of a report made under Article 5A.01(a), each local
 law enforcement agency shall establish procedures within the agency
 to provide to officers adequate information or access to
 information concerning the identity of a person identified in a
 report as a person who has previously made a threat of physical
 violence.
 (c)  The district or county attorney exercising authority in
 the county in which the law enforcement agency has jurisdiction is
 entitled to access the records created under this chapter.
 SECTION 3. Subsection (b), Section 411.042, Government
 Code, as amended by Chapters 70 (H.B. 76), 1306 (S.B. 839), and 1372
 (S.B. 9), Acts of the 80th Legislature, Regular Session, 2007, is
 reenacted and amended to read as follows:
 (b) The bureau of identification and records shall:
 (1) procure and file for record photographs, pictures,
 descriptions, fingerprints, measurements, and other pertinent
 information of all persons arrested for or charged with a criminal
 offense or convicted of a criminal offense, regardless of whether
 the conviction is probated;
 (2) collect information concerning the number and
 nature of offenses reported or known to have been committed in the
 state and the legal steps taken in connection with the offenses, and
 other information useful in the study of crime and the
 administration of justice, including information that enables the
 bureau to create a statistical breakdown of offenses in which
 family violence was involved and a statistical breakdown of
 offenses under Sections 22.011 and 22.021, Penal Code;
 (3) make ballistic tests of bullets and firearms and
 chemical analyses of bloodstains, cloth, materials, and other
 substances for law enforcement officers of the state;
 (4) cooperate with identification and crime records
 bureaus in other states and the United States Department of
 Justice;
 (5) maintain a list of all previous background checks
 for applicants for any position regulated under Chapter 1702,
 Occupations Code, who have undergone a criminal history background
 check under Section 411.119, if the check indicates a Class B
 misdemeanor or equivalent offense or a greater offense;
 (6) collect information concerning the number and
 nature of protective orders and all other pertinent information
 about all persons on active protective orders. Information in the
 law enforcement information system relating to an active protective
 order shall include:
 (A) the name, sex, race, date of birth, personal
 descriptors, address, and county of residence of the person to whom
 the order is directed;
 (B) any known identifying number of the person to
 whom the order is directed, including the person's social security
 number or driver's license number;
 (C) the name and county of residence of the
 person protected by the order;
 (D) the residence address and place of employment
 or business of the person protected by the order, unless that
 information is excluded from the order under Section 85.007, Family
 Code;
 (E) the child-care facility or school where a
 child protected by the order normally resides or which the child
 normally attends, unless that information is excluded from the
 order under Section 85.007, Family Code;
 (F) the relationship or former relationship
 between the person who is protected by the order and the person to
 whom the order is directed; and
 (G) the date the order expires; [and]
 (7) grant access to criminal history record
 information in the manner authorized under Subchapter F;
 (8) [(7)] collect and disseminate information
 regarding offenders with mental impairments in compliance with
 Chapter 614, Health and Safety Code; and
 (9)  collect and disseminate information regarding
 reports of violent threats in compliance with Chapter 5A, Code of
 Criminal Procedure.
 SECTION 4. Subsection (e), Section 611.004, Health and
 Safety Code, as added by this Act, applies only to a disclosure of
 confidential information made on or after the effective date of
 this Act.
 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *