Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1629 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 1629


 AN ACT
 relating to the persons exempted from the required prepayment of
 the personnel costs incurred by a governmental body in responding
 to requests from a requestor under the public information law that
 require large amounts of personnel time.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (j), Section 552.275, Government
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (j) This section does not apply if the requestor is an
 individual who, for a substantial portion of the individual's
 livelihood or for substantial financial gain, gathers, compiles,
 prepares, collects, photographs, records, writes, edits, reports,
 investigates, processes, or publishes news or information for and
 is seeking the information for [a representative of]:
 (1) a radio or television broadcast station that holds
 a broadcast license for an assigned frequency issued by the Federal
 Communications Commission; [or]
 (2) a newspaper that is qualified under Section
 2051.044 to publish legal notices or is a free newspaper of general
 circulation and that is published at least once a week and available
 and of interest to the general public in connection with the
 dissemination of news;
 (3)  a newspaper of general circulation that is
 published on the Internet by a news medium engaged in the business
 of disseminating news or information to the general public; or
 (4)  a magazine that is published at least once a week
 or on the Internet by a news medium engaged in the business of
 disseminating news or information to the general public.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1629 passed the Senate on
 April 28, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 30, 2009, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1629 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 148,
 Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor