Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1650 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Duncan S.B. No. 1650
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2009; March 20, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 March 31, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; March 31, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to appeals in cases arising under the Federal Arbitration
 Act.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 51, Civil Practice and
 Remedies Code, is amended by adding Section 51.016 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 51.016.  APPEAL ARISING UNDER FEDERAL ARBITRATION ACT.
 In a matter subject to the Federal Arbitration Act (9 U.S.C. Section
 1 et seq.), a person may take an appeal or writ of error to the court
 of appeals from the judgment or interlocutory order of a district
 court, county court at law, or county court under the same
 circumstances that an appeal from a federal district court's order
 or decision would be permitted by 9 U.S.C. Section 16.
 SECTION 2. (a) Except as provided by this section, the
 change in law made by this Act applies to an action filed on or after
 the effective date of this Act or pending on the effective date of
 this Act.
 (b) The change in law made by this Act does not apply to the
 appeal of an interlocutory order in an action pending on the
 effective date of this Act if the appeal of the order is initiated
 before the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *