Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1651 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Duncan S.B. No. 1651
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2009; March 20, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 March 31, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; March 31, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to state indemnification and defense of certain judges and
 certain judicial appointees.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 104.001, Civil Practice and Remedies
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 104.001. STATE LIABILITY; PERSONS COVERED. In a cause
 of action based on conduct described in Section 104.002, the state
 shall indemnify the following persons, without regard to whether
 the persons performed their services for compensation, for actual
 damages, court costs, and attorney's fees adjudged against:
 (1) an employee, a member of the governing board, or
 any other officer of a state agency, institution, or department;
 (2) a former employee, former member of the governing
 board, or any other former officer of a state agency, institution,
 or department who was an employee or officer when the act or
 omission on which the damages are based occurred;
 (3) a physician or psychiatrist licensed in this state
 who was performing services under a contract with any state agency,
 institution, or department or a racing official performing services
 under a contract with the Texas Racing Commission when the act or
 omission on which the damages are based occurred;
 (3-a) a phlebotomist licensed in this state who was
 performing services under a contract with the Texas Department of
 Criminal Justice when the act or omission on which the damages are
 based occurred;
 (4) a chaplain or spiritual advisor who was performing
 services under contract with the Texas Department of Criminal
 Justice, the Texas Youth Commission, or the Texas Juvenile
 Probation Commission when the act or omission on which the damages
 are based occurred;
 (5) a person serving on the governing board of a
 foundation, corporation, or association at the request and on
 behalf of an institution of higher education, as that term is
 defined by Section 61.003(8), Education Code, not including a
 public junior college;
 (6) a state contractor who signed a waste manifest as
 required by a state contract; [or]
 (7) a current or former appointee of the supreme court
 to a judicial board, commission, or task force who was acting in an
 official capacity as an appointee when the act or omission on which
 the damages are based occurred; or
 (8) the estate of a person listed in this section.
 SECTION 2. Section 74.141, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 74.141. DEFENSE OF JUDGES. The attorney general shall
 defend a state district judge, a presiding judge of an
 administrative region, [or] an active, retired, or former judge
 assigned under this chapter, or a current or former appointee of the
 supreme court to a judicial board, commission, or task force in any
 action or suit in any court in which the judge or appointee is a
 defendant because of his office as judge or service on the board,
 commission, or task force if the judge or appointee requests the
 attorney general's assistance in the defense of the suit.
 SECTION 3. The change in law made by this Act providing
 indemnification and defense to certain individuals applies only to
 a cause of action that accrues on or after the effective date of
 this Act. A cause of action that accrues before the effective date
 of this Act is governed by the law as it existed immediately before
 that date, and that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *