Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1654 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Van de Putte S.B. No. 1654
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2009; March 20, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Veteran Affairs and
 Military Installations; April 2, 2009, reported favorably by the
 following vote: Yeas 4, Nays 0; April 2, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the criteria for evaluating requests for defense
 economic adjustment assistance grants.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 486.008, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 486.008. EVALUATION OF APPLICATION. The panel shall
 evaluate each application and assign the applicant a score based
 on:
 (1) the significance of the adverse or positive effect
 within the local governmental entity, including the number of jobs
 lost or gained in relation to the workforce in the local
 governmental entity's jurisdiction and the effect on the area's
 economy and tax revenue;
 (2) the extent to which the local governmental entity
 has used its existing resources to promote local economic
 development;
 (3) the amount of any grant that the local
 governmental entity has previously received under this chapter;
 (4) the anticipated number of jobs to be created or
 retained in relation to the amount of the grant sought; and
 (5) the extent to which the grant will affect the
 region in which the local governmental entity is located.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *