Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1658 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Averitt S.B. No. 1658
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2009; March 20, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources;
 March 31, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 11,
 Nays 0; March 31, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an increase in the fee for natural gas pipeline safety
 inspections.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (d), Section 121.211, Utilities Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (d) The commission may assess each operator of a natural gas
 distribution system subject to this chapter an annual inspection
 fee not to exceed one dollar [50 cents] for each service line
 reported by the system on the Distribution Annual Report, Form RSPA
 F7100.1-1, due on March 15 of each year. The fee is due March 15 of
 each year.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *