Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1663 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Wentworth S.B. No. 1663
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2009; March 20, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services;
 April 24, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 24, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1663 By: Nichols


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the disregard or violation of a resident's advance
 directive by a nursing institution; providing penalties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 242.061, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  The department, after providing notice and
 opportunity for a hearing to a license holder, shall suspend or
 revoke a license if the department finds that the license holder has
 been assessed three or more administrative penalties for violating
 Section 242.0663(a)(2).
 SECTION 2. Section 242.0663, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (d) to
 read as follows:
 (a) The department shall assess an administrative penalty
 under this subchapter against an institution that:
 (1) violates Section 166.004; or
 (2)  employs or has on staff a health care practitioner
 who knowingly disregards or violates a resident's advance directive
 if the institution has included a statement in its written policies
 maintained under Section 166.004 that the institution will follow a
 resident's advance directive.
 (d)  An action by a person, including an owner or employee of
 an institution, to knowingly disregard or violate a resident's
 advance directive in violation of a written policy maintained under
 Section 166.004 constitutes abuse and neglect of the resident for
 purposes of this chapter.
 SECTION 3. Section 242.122, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  For purposes of this section, "abuse and neglect"
 includes knowingly disregarding or violating a resident's advance
 directive in violation of a written policy maintained under Section
 166.004.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *