Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1672 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Nichols S.B. No. 1672
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2009; March 20, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; April 23, 2009, reported favorably by the following
 vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; April 23, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to extension or modification of restrictive covenants in
 certain residential real estate subdivisions.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subdivision (4), Section 210.001, Property Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (4) "Residential real estate subdivision" or
 "subdivision" has the meaning assigned by Section 201.003, except
 that in a county described by Section 210.002(1) a subdivision that
 is a gated community with private streets need not be located in a
 city, town, or village or within the extraterritorial jurisdiction
 of a city, town, or village.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *