Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1675 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 1675
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2009; March 20, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Jurisprudence;
 April 24, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 4, Nays 0; April 24, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1675 By: Hinojosa


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to donations of juror reimbursements.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (a), Section 61.003, Government Code,
 as amended by Chapters 661 (H.B. 1204) and 1378 (S.B. 560), Acts of
 the 80th Legislature, Regular Session, 2007, is reenacted and
 amended to read as follows:
 (a) Each person who reports for jury service shall be
 personally provided a form letter that when signed by the person
 directs the county treasurer to donate all, or a specific amount
 designated by the person, of the person's daily reimbursement under
 this chapter to:
 (1) the compensation to victims of crime fund under
 Subchapter B, Chapter 56, Code of Criminal Procedure;
 (2) the child welfare, child protective services, or
 child services board of the county appointed under Section 264.005,
 Family Code, that serves abused and neglected children;
 (3) any program selected by the commissioners court
 that is operated by a public or private nonprofit organization and
 that provides shelter and services to victims of family violence;
 or
 (4) any other program approved by the commissioners
 court of the county, including a program established under Article
 56.04(f), Code of Criminal Procedure, that offers psychological
 counseling to jurors in criminal cases involving graphic evidence
 or testimony.
 SECTION 2. Section 61.003, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (a-2) to read as follows:
 (a-2)  The form letter provided under Subsection (a) must
 contain a brief description of the programs designated for donation
 under that subsection.
 SECTION 3. The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to donations from jurors appearing in response to a summons issued
 on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *