Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1681 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 1681
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2009; March 20, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 April 2, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 2, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1681 By: Hinojosa


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to requiring the corroboration of certain testimony to
 support a criminal conviction.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Chapter 38, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by adding Article 38.075 to read as follows:
 Art. 38.075.  CORROBORATION OF CERTAIN TESTIMONY REQUIRED.
 (a)  A defendant may not be convicted of an offense on the testimony
 of a person to whom the defendant made a statement against the
 defendant's interest during a time when the person was imprisoned
 or confined in the same correctional facility as the defendant
 unless the testimony is corroborated by other evidence tending to
 connect the defendant with the offense committed.  In this
 subsection, "correctional facility" has the meaning assigned by
 Section 1.07, Penal Code.
 (b)  Corroboration is not sufficient for the purposes of this
 article if the corroboration only shows that the offense was
 committed.
 SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies to any
 case in which a judgment has not been entered before the effective
 date of this Act. A case in which a judgment has been entered before
 the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect when
 the judgment was entered, and the former law is continued in effect
 for that purpose.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *