Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1693 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Ogden S.B. No. 1693
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2009; March 20, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture and Rural
 Affairs; April 20, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0;
 April 20, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1693 By: Jackson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the regulation of poultry facilities and poultry
 litter.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 382, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 382.068 to read as follows:
 Sec. 382.068.  POULTRY FACILITY ODOR; RESPONSE TO COMPLAINTS.
 (a)  In this section, "poultry facility" and "poultry litter" have
 the meanings assigned by Section 26.301, Water Code.
 (b)  The commission shall respond and investigate not later
 than 18 hours after receiving one of the following types of
 complaints:
 (1)  a second complaint concerning odor associated with
 a poultry facility or the application of poultry litter; or
 (2)  a complaint concerning odor from a poultry
 facility where the commission has previously substantiated
 nuisance odor conditions in the past 12 months.
 (c)  If after the investigation the commission determines
 that a poultry facility is violating the terms of its air quality
 authorization or creating a nuisance, the commission shall issue a
 notice of violation.
 (d)  If three notices of violations are issued by the
 commission in any 12-month period for a single poultry facility,
 the commission shall enter into a comprehensive compliance
 agreement with the facility.
 (e)  All comprehensive compliance agreements between poultry
 facilities and the commission shall:
 (1)  include an odor control plan detailing a
 facility's plans to control odors; and
 (2)  establish requirements for the submission and
 approval of the odor control plan by the commission.
 (f)  The commission may require changes to a plan submitted
 under Subsection (e) if the executive director determines that the
 plan is insufficient to control odors.
 (g)  The owner or operator of a poultry facility which begins
 construction after September 1, 2009, shall complete a poultry
 facility training course on the prevention of odor nuisances from
 the poultry science unit of the Texas AgriLife Extension Service
 not later than 90 days after the date the facility first accepts
 poultry to raise.
 (h)  The owner or operator of a poultry facility subject to
 Subsection (g) shall maintain records of the training and make the
 records available to the commission for inspection.
 (i)  The poultry science unit of the Texas AgriLife Extension
 Service may collect a fee from an owner or operator of a poultry
 facility subject to Subsection (g) to offset the direct cost of
 providing the training.
 SECTION 2. Section 26.302, Water Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 26.302. REGULATION OF POULTRY FACILITIES. (a) A
 person who owns or operates a poultry facility shall ensure that the
 facility has adequate means or is adequately equipped to handle and
 dispose of poultry carcasses, poultry litter, and other poultry
 waste regardless of whether the person owns the poultry.
 (b) A person who owns or operates a poultry facility shall
 implement and maintain a water quality management plan for the
 facility that is certified by the State Soil and Water Conservation
 Board under Section 201.026, Agriculture Code.
 (b-1) The State Soil and Water Conservation Board may
 certify a water quality management plan for a poultry facility
 that:
 (1) does not use a liquid waste handling system; and
 (2) is required to obtain a permit or other
 authorization from the commission.
 (c) The State Soil and Water Conservation Board shall not
 certify a water quality management plan for a poultry facility
 located within one-half mile of surrounding businesses,
 permanently inhabited residences, or places of worship if the
 presence of the facility is likely to create a persistent odor
 nuisance for such neighbors, unless the poultry facility provides a
 suitable odor control plan.
 (d)  The State Soil and Water Conservation Board shall by
 rule establish criteria for the siting and construction of new
 poultry facilities, in consultation with the Texas Commission on
 Environmental Quality, to determine what geographic, seasonal, and
 agronomic factors should be considered when determining whether a
 persistent nuisance odor condition is likely to occur.
 (e)  Subsection (c) does not apply to a revision of a
 previously certified and existing water quality management plan or
 to any poultry facility which is located more than one-half mile
 from surrounding businesses, permanently inhabited residences, or
 places of worship established before the date of construction of
 the poultry facility.
 (f) The commission may bring a cause of action to remedy or
 prevent a violation of this section.
 (g) This section does not affect the authority of the
 commission to investigate or take enforcement action against an
 unauthorized discharge under Section 26.121.
 SUBSECTION 3. Subchapter H, Chapter 26, Water Code, is
 amended by adding Sections 26.304 and 26.305 to read as follows:
 Sec. 26.304.  RECORDS OF SALE, PURCHASE, TRANSFER, OR
 APPLICATION OF POULTRY LITTER.  (a)  A poultry facility that sells
 or transfers poultry litter for remote application must maintain,
 until the second anniversary of the date of sale or transfer, a
 record regarding:
 (1) the identity of the purchaser or applicator;
 (2) the physical destination of the poultry litter;
 (3)  the date the poultry litter was removed from the
 poultry facility; and
 (4) the number of tons of poultry litter removed.
 (b)  A person that purchases or obtains poultry litter for
 application must maintain, until the second anniversary of the date
 of application, a signed and dated proof of delivery document for
 every load of poultry litter land applied.  The landowner shall note
 on the document the date on which the poultry litter was land
 applied.
 Sec. 26.305.  INSPECTION OF RECORDS.  The commission may
 inspect any record required to be maintained under this subchapter.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *