Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1701 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Fraser S.B. No. 1701
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2009; March 20, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 April 9, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 9, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the franchise arrangements excluded from the Business
 Opportunity Act.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (b), Section 51.003, Business &
 Commerce Code, as effective April 1, 2009, is amended to read as
 follows:
 (b) In this chapter, "business opportunity" does not
 include:
 (1) the sale or lease of an established and ongoing
 business or enterprise that has actively conducted business before
 the sale or lease, whether composed of one or more than one
 component business or enterprise, if the sale or lease represents
 an isolated transaction or series of transactions involving a bona
 fide change of ownership or control of the business or enterprise or
 liquidation of the business or enterprise;
 (2) a sale by a retailer of goods or services under a
 contract or other agreement to sell the inventory of one or more
 ongoing leased departments to a purchaser who is granted the right
 to sell the goods or services within or adjoining a retail business
 establishment as a department or division of the retail business
 establishment;
 (3) a transaction that is:
 (A) regulated by the Texas Department of
 Licensing and Regulation, the Texas Department of Insurance, the
 Texas Real Estate Commission, or the director of the Motor Vehicle
 Division of the Texas Department of Transportation; and
 (B) engaged in by a person licensed by one of
 those agencies;
 (4) a real estate syndication;
 (5) a sale or lease to a business enterprise that also
 sells or leases products, equipment, or supplies or performs
 services:
 (A) that are not supplied by the seller; and
 (B) that the purchaser does not use with the
 seller's products, equipment, supplies, or services;
 (6) the offer or sale of a franchise as described by
 the Petroleum Marketing Practices Act (15 U.S.C. Section 2801 et
 seq.) and its subsequent amendments;
 (7) the offer or sale of a business opportunity if the
 seller:
 (A) has a net worth of $25 million or more
 according to the seller's audited balance sheet as of a date not
 earlier than the 13th month before the date of the transaction; or
 (B) is at least 80 percent owned by another
 person who:
 (i) in writing unconditionally guarantees
 performance by the person offering the business opportunity plan;
 and
 (ii) has a net worth of more than $25
 million according to the person's most recent audited balance sheet
 as of a date not earlier than the 13th month before the date of the
 transaction; or
 (8) an arrangement defined as a franchise by 16 C.F.R.
 Part 436 [Section 436.2(a)] and its subsequent amendments if:
 (A) the franchisor complies in all material
 respects in this state with 16 C.F.R. Part 436 and each order or
 other action of the Federal Trade Commission; and
 (B) before offering for sale or selling a
 franchise in this state, a person files with the secretary of state
 a notice containing:
 (i) the name of the franchisor;
 (ii) the name under which the franchisor
 intends to transact business; and
 (iii) the franchisor's principal business
 address.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *