Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1702 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Fraser S.B. No. 1702
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2009; March 20, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 April 14, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 14, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1702 By: Fraser


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the regulation of health spas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 702.155, Occupations Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 702.155. DURATION OF SECURITY. A certificate holder
 shall maintain the security filed or posted under Section 702.151
 in effect until the earlier [later] of:
 (1) the second anniversary of the date the certificate
 holder's health spa closes; or
 (2) the date the secretary of state determines that
 each claim filed against the security has been satisfied or
 foreclosed by law.
 SECTION 2. Subsection (b), Section 702.156, Occupations
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (b) If the security filed or posted under this subchapter by
 a certificate holder is canceled, the secretary of state shall:
 (1) suspend the certificate holder's certificate of
 registration on the date of cancellation; and
 (2) maintain other security on file with the secretary
 until the earlier [later] of:
 (A) the second anniversary of the date the
 certificate holder's health spa closes; or
 (B) the date the secretary determines that each
 claim filed against the security has been satisfied or foreclosed
 by law.
 SECTION 3. Section 702.251, Occupations Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 702.251. FILING OF SECURITY CLAIM. A member may file a
 claim against the security filed or posted under this subchapter by
 providing [sending] to the secretary of state [by certified mail] a
 copy of the contract between the member and certificate holder who
 filed or posted the security, accompanied by proof of payment made
 under the contract, if the certificate holder's health spa:
 (1) closes and fails to provide alternative facilities
 not more than 10 miles from the location of the health spa; or
 (2) relocates more than 10 miles from its location
 preceding the relocation.
 SECTION 4. Subsection (a), Section 702.304, Occupations
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b), a contract must
 state in at least 10-point type that is boldfaced, capitalized,
 underlined, or otherwise conspicuously distinguished from
 surrounding written material:
 (1) "NOTICE TO PURCHASER: DO NOT SIGN THIS CONTRACT
 UNTIL YOU READ IT OR IF IT CONTAINS BLANK SPACES."
 (2) "IF YOU DECIDE YOU DO NOT WISH TO REMAIN A MEMBER
 OF THIS HEALTH SPA, YOU MAY CANCEL THIS CONTRACT BY MAILING TO THE
 HEALTH SPA BY MIDNIGHT OF THE THIRD BUSINESS DAY AFTER THE DAY YOU
 SIGN THIS CONTRACT A NOTICE STATING YOUR DESIRE TO CANCEL THIS
 CONTRACT. THE WRITTEN NOTICE MUST BE MAILED BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO
 THE FOLLOWING ADDRESS:
 (Address of the health spa home office)."
 (3) "IF THE HEALTH SPA GOES OUT OF BUSINESS AND DOES
 NOT PROVIDE FACILITIES WITHIN 10 MILES OF THE FACILITY IN WHICH YOU
 ARE ENROLLED OR IF THE HEALTH SPA MOVES MORE THAN 10 MILES FROM THE
 FACILITY IN WHICH YOU ARE ENROLLED, YOU MAY:
 (A) CANCEL THIS CONTRACT BY MAILING BY CERTIFIED
 MAIL A WRITTEN NOTICE STATING YOUR DESIRE TO CANCEL THIS CONTRACT,
 ACCOMPANIED BY PROOF OF PAYMENT ON THE CONTRACT TO THE HEALTH SPA AT
 THE FOLLOWING ADDRESS:
 (Address of the health spa home office); AND
 (B) FILE A WRITTEN NOTICE OF A CLAIM FOR A REFUND
 OF YOUR UNUSED MEMBERSHIP FEES AGAINST THE BOND OR OTHER SECURITY
 POSTED BY THE HEALTH SPA WITH THE TEXAS SECRETARY OF STATE. TO MAKE
 A CLAIM AGAINST THE SECURITY SEND A COPY OF YOUR CONTRACT TOGETHER
 WITH PROOF OF PAYMENTS MADE ON THE CONTRACT TO THE TEXAS SECRETARY
 OF STATE. [THE WRITTEN NOTICE MUST BE MAILED BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO
 THE FOLLOWING ADDRESS:
 [OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE
 [STATUTORY DOCUMENTS SECTION
 [P.O. BOX 12887
 [AUSTIN, TEXAS 78711-2887.]"
 (4) "IF YOU DIE OR BECOME TOTALLY AND PERMANENTLY
 DISABLED AFTER THE DATE THIS CONTRACT TAKES EFFECT, YOU OR YOUR
 ESTATE MAY CANCEL THIS CONTRACT AND RECEIVE A PARTIAL REFUND OF YOUR
 UNUSED MEMBERSHIP FEE BY MAILING A NOTICE TO THE HEALTH SPA STATING
 YOUR DESIRE TO CANCEL THIS CONTRACT. THE HEALTH SPA MAY REQUIRE
 PROOF OF DISABILITY OR DEATH. THE WRITTEN NOTICE MUST BE MAILED BY
 CERTIFIED MAIL TO THE FOLLOWING ADDRESS:
 (Address of the health spa home office)."
 SECTION 5. Subsection (a), Section 702.452, Occupations
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a) At least 30 days before the date a health spa is
 scheduled to close or relocate, the certificate holder shall
 contemporaneously:
 (1) post, inside and outside each entrance to the
 health spa, a notice stating:
 (A) the date the health spa is scheduled to close
 or relocate;
 (B) that a member of the health spa may, not later
 than the 90th day after the date the notice is first posted [health
 spa closes or relocates], file with the secretary of state a claim
 to recover actual financial loss suffered by the member as a result
 of the health spa closing; and
 (C) the procedures for perfecting a security
 claim; and
 (2) notify the secretary of state in writing of the
 health spa closing or relocation and the date that the notice was
 first posted.
 SECTION 6. The changes in law made by this Act to Section
 702.251, Occupations Code, and Subsection (a), Section 702.304, and
 Subsection (a), Section 702.452, Occupations Code, apply only to a
 contract that is entered into on or after the effective date of this
 Act. A contract entered into before the effective date of this Act
 is governed by the law in effect immediately before that date, and
 the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 7. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *