Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1715 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: West S.B. No. 1715
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2009; March 20, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 April 14, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 14, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1715 By: Estes


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the requirements for a smoke detector in a multifamily
 residential unit.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 92.254, Property Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (a-1) to read as
 follows:
 (a) A smoke detector must be:
 (1) designed to detect both the visible and invisible
 products of combustion;
 (2) designed with an alarm audible to a person in the
 bedrooms it serves;
 (3) powered by battery, alternating current, or other
 power source as required by local ordinance;
 (4) tested and listed for use as a smoke detector by
 Underwriters Laboratories, Inc., Factory Mutual Research
 Corporation, or United States Testing Company, Inc.; and
 (5) in good working order.
 (a-1)  If requested by a tenant as an accommodation for a
 person with a disability or as required by law as a reasonable
 accommodation for a person with a disability, a smoke detector
 must, in addition to complying with Subsection (a), be capable of
 alerting a hearing-impaired person in the bedrooms it serves.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *