Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1717 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: West S.B. No. 1717
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2009; March 20, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; April 20, 2009, reported favorably by the following
 vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; April 20, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to prohibition of certain practices by owners of
 developments supported with low income housing tax credit
 allocations.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter DD, Chapter 2306, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2306.6736 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2306.6736.  PROHIBITED PRACTICES.  (a)  Notwithstanding
 any other law, a development owner of a development supported with a
 housing tax credit allocation may not:
 (1)  lock out or threaten to lock out any person
 residing in the development except by judicial process unless the
 exclusion results from:
 (A)  a necessity to perform bona fide repairs or
 construction work; or
 (B) an emergency; or
 (2)  seize or threaten to seize the personal property
 of any person residing in the development except by judicial
 process unless the resident has abandoned the premises.
 (b) Each development owner shall:
 (1)  include a conspicuous provision in the lease
 agreement prohibiting the owner from engaging in a practice
 described by Subsection (a); and
 (2)  remove in the manner specified by department rule
 any provisions in the lease agreement that are contrary to
 Subsection (a).
 SECTION 2. The Texas Department of Housing and Community
 Affairs shall adopt rules as necessary to implement and enforce
 Section 2306.6736, Government Code, as added by this Act, not later
 than November 1, 2009.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *