S.B. No. 1717 AN ACT relating to regulation of owners of developments supported with low income housing tax credit allocations and of housing sponsors of certain multifamily housing developments. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter L, Chapter 2306, Government Code, is amended by adding Section 2306.2631 to read as follows: Sec. 2306.2631. REPORTS BY SPONSORS OF CERTAIN MULTIFAMILY HOUSING DEVELOPMENTS. (a) This section applies only to a housing sponsor of a multifamily housing development that: (1) receives financial assistance from the state; (2) receives financial assistance from the federal government, including an allocation of low income housing tax credits; or (3) is subject to a land use restriction agreement. (b) The department by rule shall require the housing sponsor of a multifamily housing development to submit a quarterly report to the department. The report must include information that identifies: (1) the number of vacant units in the development at the time of the report; and (2) the number of days that each unit has been vacant. (c) The department shall provide to each member of the legislature, on request of that member, a report that disaggregates the information collected under Subsection (b) by zip code in the member's district. SECTION 2. Subchapter DD, Chapter 2306, Government Code, is amended by adding Section 2306.6736 to read as follows: Sec. 2306.6736. PROHIBITED PRACTICES. (a) Notwithstanding any other law, a development owner of a development supported with a housing tax credit allocation may not: (1) lock out or threaten to lock out any person residing in the development except by judicial process unless the exclusion results from: (A) a necessity to perform bona fide repairs or construction work; or (B) an emergency; or (2) seize or threaten to seize the personal property of any person residing in the development except by judicial process unless the resident has abandoned the premises. (b) Each development owner shall: (1) include a conspicuous provision in the lease agreement prohibiting the owner from engaging in a practice described by Subsection (a); and (2) remove in the manner specified by department rule any provisions in the lease agreement that are contrary to Subsection (a). SECTION 3. The Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs shall adopt rules as necessary to implement and enforce Section 2306.6736, Government Code, as added by this Act, not later than November 1, 2009. SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1717 passed the Senate on April 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 28, Nays 3; and that the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 29, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 28, Nays 3. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1717 passed the House, with amendment, on May 18, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 89, Nays 52, one present not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House Approved: ______________________________ Date ______________________________ Governor