Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1728 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: West S.B. No. 1728
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2009; March 20, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 April 20, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; April 20, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1728 By: West


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the administration of and eligibility for the Joint
 Admissions Medical Program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (a), Section 51.826, Education Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (a) To be eligible for admission to the program or for
 selection as a program alternate, an undergraduate student must:
 (1) [have enrolled at an institution of higher
 education not later than the first fall semester following the
 student's graduation from high school;
 [(2)] be enrolled at a general academic teaching
 institution or a private or independent institution of higher
 education at the time of application to the program;
 (2) [(3)] be a Texas resident for purposes of tuition
 under Subchapter B, Chapter 54;
 (3) [(4)] except as provided by Subsection (c),
 successfully complete at least 27 semester credit hours during the
 student's freshman year;
 (4) [(5)] apply for admission to the program not later
 than a date, as designated by the council, that occurs during the
 fall semester of the student's sophomore year at the general
 academic teaching institution or the private or independent
 institution of higher education; and
 (5) [(6)] meet criteria established by the council
 regarding:
 (A) minimum high school and undergraduate grade
 point averages;
 (B) financial need and any other indication of
 economic disadvantage; and
 (C) any other matter the council considers
 appropriate.
 SECTION 2. The following laws are repealed:
 (1) Subsection (b), Section 51.823, Education Code;
 and
 (2) Subsection (c), Section 51.8265, Education Code.
 SECTION 3. The changes in law made by this Act to Sections
 51.826 and 51.8265, Education Code, apply beginning with applicants
 for admission to the Joint Admission Medical Program during the
 2009-2010 academic year.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *