Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1759 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Watson S.B. No. 1759
 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2009; March 20, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Homeland
 Security; April 14, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 April 14, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1759 By: Watson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the extended registration of a commercial fleet of
 motor vehicles.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 502.001, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subdivision (1-a) to read as follows:
 (1-a)  "Commercial fleet" means a group of at least 25
 nonapportioned motor vehicles owned by a corporation, limited or
 general partnership, limited liability company, or other business
 entity and used for the business purposes of that entity.
 SECTION 2. Subchapter A, Chapter 502, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 502.0023 to read as follows:
 Sec. 502.0023.  EXTENDED REGISTRATION OF COMMERCIAL FLEET
 MOTOR VEHICLES.  (a)  Notwithstanding Section 502.158(c), the
 department shall develop and implement a system of registration to
 allow an owner of a commercial fleet to register the motor vehicles
 in the commercial fleet for an extended registration period of not
 less than one year or more than eight years.  The owner may select
 the number of years for registration under this section within that
 range and register the commercial fleet for that period.  Payment
 for all registration fees for the entire registration period
 selected is due at the time of registration.
 (b)  In addition to the registration fees prescribed by
 Subchapter D, an owner registering a commercial fleet under this
 section shall pay:
 (1)  an annual commercial fleet registration fee of $10
 per motor vehicle in the fleet; and
 (2)  a one-time license plate manufacturing fee of
 $1.50 for each fleet motor vehicle license plate.
 (c) A license plate issued under this section:
 (1)  may, on request of the owner, include the name or
 logo of the business entity that owns the vehicle;
 (2)  must include the expiration date of the
 registration period; and
 (3)  does not require an annual registration insignia
 to be valid.
 (d)  If a motor vehicle registered under this section has a
 gross weight in excess of 10,000 pounds, the department shall also
 issue a registration card for the vehicle that is valid for the
 selected registration period.
 (e)  The department shall adopt rules to implement this
 section, including rules on suspension from the commercial fleet
 program for failure to comply with this section or rules adopted
 under this section.
 SECTION 3. Subsection (b), Section 501.0234,
 Transportation Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (b) This section does not apply to a motor vehicle:
 (1) that has been declared a total loss by an insurance
 company in the settlement or adjustment of a claim;
 (2) for which the certificate of title has been
 surrendered in exchange for:
 (A) a salvage vehicle title issued under this
 chapter;
 (B) a nonrepairable vehicle title issued under
 this chapter;
 (C) a certificate of authority issued under
 Subchapter D, Chapter 683; or
 (D) an ownership document issued by another state
 that is comparable to a document described by Paragraphs (A)-(C);
 [or]
 (3) with a gross weight in excess of 11,000 pounds; or
 (4)  purchased by a commercial fleet buyer who utilizes
 the dealer title application process developed to provide a method
 to submit title transactions to counties that have approved the
 persons as full-service deputies under Section 502.114.
 SECTION 4. The Texas Department of Transportation shall
 adopt the rules and establish the system required under Section
 502.0023, Transportation Code, as added by this Act, not later than
 September 1, 2010.
 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *