Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1783 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Carona S.B. No. 1783
 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2009; March 20, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Homeland
 Security; April 22, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0;
 April 22, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1783 By: Carona


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of an offender identification card or similar
 form of identification as proof of identity for an applicant for a
 driver's license or commercial driver's license.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (a), Section 521.142, Transportation
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a) An application for an original license must state the
 applicant's full name and place and date of birth. This information
 must be verified by presentation of proof of identity satisfactory
 to the department. The department must accept as satisfactory
 proof of identity under this subsection an offender identification
 card or similar form of identification issued to an inmate by the
 Texas Department of Criminal Justice if the applicant also provides
 supplemental verifiable records or documents that aid in
 establishing identity.
 SECTION 2. Subchapter G, Chapter 521, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 521.1421 to read as follows:
 Sec. 521.1421.  INMATE IDENTIFICATION VERIFICATION PILOT
 PROGRAM.  (a)  The department shall participate in an inmate
 identification verification pilot program for the purpose of
 issuing driver's licenses and personal identification certificates
 to inmates of the Texas Department of Criminal Justice.
 (b) Under the pilot program, the department may:
 (1)  enter into a contract with the Texas Department of
 Criminal Justice and the Department of State Health Services to
 establish an identification verification process for inmates of the
 Texas Department of Criminal Justice; and
 (2)  issue a driver's license or a personal
 identification certificate to an inmate whose identity has been
 confirmed through the verification process and who otherwise meets
 the requirements for the issuance of the driver's license or
 personal identification certificate.
 (c)  At the conclusion of the pilot program the governing
 bodies of the participating agencies may agree to continue the
 pilot program on a permanent basis.
 (d)  Not later than December 1, 2010, the department and the
 Texas Department of Criminal Justice shall jointly issue a report
 to the standing committees of the legislature with jurisdiction
 over issues related to criminal justice and homeland security
 addressing:
 (1) the status of the pilot program;
 (2) the effectiveness of the pilot program; and
 (3)  an analysis of the feasibility of implementing a
 statewide program based on the pilot program.
 SECTION 3. Subsection (c-1), Section 522.021,
 Transportation Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (c-1) If the department requires proof of an applicant's
 identity as part of an application under this section, the
 department must accept as satisfactory proof of identity an
 offender identification card or similar form of identification
 issued to an inmate by the Texas Department of Criminal Justice if
 the applicant also provides supplemental verifiable records or
 documents that aid in establishing identity.
 SECTION 4. The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 an application for a driver's license, commercial driver's license,
 or personal identification certificate submitted on or after the
 effective date of this Act. An application for a driver's license,
 commercial driver's license, or personal identification
 certificate submitted before the effective date of this Act is
 subject to the law in effect on the date the application was
 submitted, and that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *