By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 1803 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2009; March 20, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services; May 1, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 1, 2009, sent to printer.) COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1803 By: Zaffirini A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the Glenda Dawson Donate Life-Texas Registry. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subsection (m), Section 49.002, Health and Safety Code, is amended to read as follows: (m) In consultation with the Texas Organ, Tissue, and Eye Donor Council, the department shall [may] implement a training program for all appropriate Department of Public Safety and Texas Department of Transportation employees on the benefits of organ, tissue, and eye donation and the procedures for individuals to be added to the statewide Internet-based registry of organ, tissue, and eye donors. Department of Public Safety and Texas Department of Transportation employees are not required to answer customer questions about donation or transplantation. The Department of Public Safety training under this section must include training on asking the appropriate question under Section 521.401(c)(1)(B). The department, with expert council input and support, shall implement the training program [before the date that the statewide Internet-based registry is operational] and [shall] conduct the training on an ongoing basis for new employees. SECTION 2. Subsection (d), Section 692.003, Health and Safety Code, is amended to read as follows: (d) A gift made by a document other than a will is effective on the death of the donor. The document may be a card designed to be carried by the donor or another record signed by the donor or other person making the gift. A statement or symbol in an online donor registry and authorized by the donor indicating the donor has made an anatomical gift may also serve as a document making a gift. To be effective, the document must be signed by the donor in the presence of two witnesses except as otherwise provided by Subchapter Q, Chapter 521, Transportation Code, this subsection, or other law. If the donor cannot sign the document, a person may sign the document for the donor at the donor's direction and in the presence of the donor and two witnesses. The witnesses to the signing of a document under this subsection must sign the document in the presence of the donor. Delivery of the document during the donor's lifetime is not necessary to make the gift valid. An online donation registration does not require the consent of another person or require two witnesses. The online registration constitutes a legal document under this chapter and remains binding after the donor's death. SECTION 3. Subchapter D, Chapter 502, Transportation Code, is amended by adding Section 502.189 to read as follows: Sec. 502.189. DONOR REGISTRY INFORMATION. (a) The department, with expert input and support from the Texas Organ, Tissue, and Eye Donor Council, shall: (1) add a link from the department's Internet website to the Donor Education, Awareness, and Registry Program of Texas established under Chapter 49, Health and Safety Code; and (2) provide a method to distribute donor registry information to interested individuals in each office authorized to issue motor vehicle registrations. (b) The department shall make available for distribution to each office authorized to issue motor vehicle registrations Donate Life brochures that provide basic donor information in English and Spanish and a contact phone number and e-mail address. The department shall ensure that the question provided in Section 521.401(c)(1)(B) and information on the donor registry Internet website is included with registration renewal notices. SECTION 4. Section 521.401, Transportation Code, is amended by amending Subsection (c) and adding Subsection (e) to read as follows: (c) Donor registry information [cards] shall be provided to the department and the Texas Department of Transportation by qualified organ or tissue procurement organizations or eye banks, as those terms are defined in Section 692.002, Health and Safety Code, or by the Donor Education, Awareness, and Registry Program of Texas established under Chapter 49, Health and Safety Code. The department, with expert input and support from the Texas Organ, Tissue, and Eye Donor Council, shall: (1) provide to each applicant for the issuance of an original, renewal, corrected, or duplicate driver's license or personal identification certificate who applies in person, by mail, over the Internet, or by other electronic means: (A) the opportunity to indicate on the person's driver's license or personal identification certificate that the person is willing to make an anatomical gift, in the event of death, in accordance with Section 692.003, Health and Safety Code; and (B) an opportunity for the person to consent in writing to the department's provision of the person's name, date of birth, driver's license number, most recent address, and other information needed for identification purposes at the time of donation to the organization selected by the commissioner of state health services under Chapter 49, Health and Safety Code, for inclusion in the statewide Internet-based registry of organ, tissue, and eye donors and for release to qualified organ, tissue, and eye bank organizations by specifically asking each applicant only the question, "Would you like to register as an organ donor?"; and (2) provide a means to distribute donor registry information [cards] to interested individuals in each office authorized to issue driver's licenses or personal identification certificates. (e) The department shall distribute at all field offices Donate Life brochures that provide basic donation information in English and Spanish and include a contact phone number and e-mail address. The department shall include the question required under Subsection (c)(1)(B) and information on the donor registry Internet website in renewal notices. SECTION 5. Not later than January 1, 2010: (1) the Department of State Health Services shall implement the training program required under Subsection (m), Section 49.002, Health and Safety Code, as amended by this Act; (2) the Department of Public Safety of the State of Texas shall implement Section 521.401, Transportation Code, as amended by this Act; and (3) the Texas Department of Transportation shall implement Section 502.189, Transportation Code, as added by this Act. SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009. * * * * *