Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1804 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    81R5296 TRH-D
 By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 1804


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to medical assistance reimbursement for the provision of a
 wheeled mobility system to a recipient of medical assistance.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 32, Human Resources Code,
 is amended by adding Section 32.0424 to read as follows:
 Sec. 32.0424.  REIMBURSEMENT FOR WHEELED MOBILITY SYSTEMS.
 (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Qualified rehabilitation professional" means a
 person who:
 (A)  holds a certification as an assistive
 technology professional or a rehabilitation engineering
 technologist issued by, and is in good standing with, the
 Rehabilitation Engineering and Assistive Technology Society of
 North America, provided that the requirements for that
 certification are at least as stringent as the requirements in
 effect on January 1, 2009; or
 (B)  is otherwise qualified to conduct the
 professional activities of a person who holds a certification
 described by Paragraph (A), as determined by rules adopted by the
 executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission.
 (2)  "Wheeled mobility system" means an item of durable
 medical equipment that is a powered or manual mobility system,
 including:
 (A) seated positioning components;
 (B) powered or manual seating options;
 (C) electronic drive control;
 (D) specialty driving controls;
 (E) multiple adjustment frame;
 (F) nonstandard performance options; and
 (G) other complex or specialized components.
 (b)  The department may provide medical assistance
 reimbursement for a wheeled mobility system only if:
 (1)  the system is provided to a recipient by a medical
 assistance provider that is, or directly employs, a qualified
 rehabilitation professional; and
 (2)  at the time the wheeled mobility system is
 delivered to the recipient, the qualified rehabilitation
 professional conducts an evaluation of the system in relation to
 the recipient.
 (c)  The executive commissioner of the Health and Human
 Services Commission shall adopt rules specifying:
 (1)  the scope, including any required components, of
 the evaluation required by Subsection (b); and
 (2)  documentation of the evaluation that must be
 submitted as part of a claim for reimbursement for the provision of
 a wheeled mobility system.
 SECTION 2. Not later than January 1, 2011, the executive
 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall
 adopt the rules required by Section 32.0424(b), Human Resources
 Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3. The changes in law made by Section 32.0424, Human
 Resources Code, as added by this Act, apply only to a claim for
 medical assistance reimbursement made for a wheeled mobility system
 that is provided on or after September 1, 2011. A claim for medical
 assistance reimbursement made for a system that is provided before
 that date is governed by the law in effect on the date the system was
 provided, and that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4. If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.