Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1804 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 1804


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to medical assistance reimbursement for wheeled mobility
 systems for recipients of medical assistance.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 32, Human Resources Code,
 is amended by adding Section 32.0424 to read as follows:
 Sec. 32.0424.  REIMBURSEMENT FOR WHEELED MOBILITY SYSTEMS.
 (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Qualified rehabilitation professional" means a
 person who:
 (A)  holds a certification as an assistive
 technology professional or a rehabilitation engineering
 technologist issued by, and is in good standing with, the
 Rehabilitation Engineering and Assistive Technology Society of
 North America, provided that the requirements for that
 certification are at least as stringent as the requirements in
 effect on January 1, 2009; or
 (B)  is otherwise qualified to conduct the
 professional activities of a person who holds a certification
 described by Paragraph (A), as determined by rules adopted by the
 executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission.
 (2)  "Wheeled mobility system" means an item of durable
 medical equipment that is a customized powered or manual mobility
 device or a feature or component of the device, including the
 following features and components:
 (A) seated positioning components;
 (B) powered or manual seating options;
 (C) specialty driving controls;
 (D) multiple adjustment frame;
 (E) nonstandard performance options; and
 (F) other complex or specialized components.
 (b)  The department may provide medical assistance
 reimbursement for the provision of, or the performance of a major
 modification to, a wheeled mobility system only if:
 (1)  the system is delivered to a recipient by a medical
 assistance provider that is, or directly employs, a qualified
 rehabilitation professional and that professional was present and
 involved in any clinical assessment of the recipient that is
 required for obtaining the system; and
 (2)  at the time the wheeled mobility system is
 delivered to the recipient, the qualified rehabilitation
 professional:
 (A)  is present for and directs a fitting to
 ensure that the system is appropriate for the recipient; and
 (B)  verifies that the system functions relative
 to the recipient.
 (c)  The executive commissioner of the Health and Human
 Services Commission shall adopt rules specifying:
 (1)  the scope, including any required components, of
 the fitting and verification of functionality required by
 Subsection (b);
 (2)  documentation of the fitting and verification of
 functionality that must be submitted as part of a claim for
 reimbursement for the provision or modification of a wheeled
 mobility system; and
 (3)  the appropriate reimbursement methodology for
 compensating the evaluation and final fitting services provided by
 qualified rehabilitation professionals involved in the provision
 or modification of wheeled mobility systems.
 SECTION 2. Not later than January 1, 2011, the executive
 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall
 adopt the rules required by Subsection (c), Section 32.0424, Human
 Resources Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3. The changes in law made by Section 32.0424, Human
 Resources Code, as added by this Act, apply only to a claim for
 medical assistance reimbursement made for a wheeled mobility system
 that is delivered on or after September 1, 2011. A claim for
 medical assistance reimbursement made for a system that is
 delivered before that date is governed by the law in effect on the
 date the system was delivered, and that law is continued in effect
 for that purpose.
 SECTION 4. If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.