Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1820 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Fraser S.B. No. 1820
 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2009; March 20, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Jurisprudence;
 April 14, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 14, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1820 By: Hinojosa


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the calculation of a person's net resources for
 purposes of determining child support liability.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (c), Section 154.062, Family Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (c) Resources do not include:
 (1) return of principal or capital;
 (2) accounts receivable; [or]
 (3) benefits paid in accordance with the Temporary
 Assistance for Needy Families program; or
 (4) payments for foster care of a child [aid for
 families with dependent children].
 SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act to Subsection
 (c), Section 154.062, Family Code, applies only to a proceeding to
 establish or modify a child support obligation that is pending in a
 trial court on or filed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *