Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1823 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Seliger S.B. No. 1823
 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2009; March 20, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources;
 April 16, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 10, Nays 0; April 16, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1823 By: Seliger


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the state's statutory and contractual liens to secure
 the payment of unpaid royalty and other amounts due under oil and
 gas leases of state land.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 52.136, Natural Resources Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsections (b-1),
 (b-2), (b-3), and (d) to read as follows:
 (b) By acceptance of a lease, the lessee grants to the state
 an express contractual lien on and security interest in all oil and
 gas in and extracted from the area covered by the lease, all
 proceeds which may accrue to the lessee from the sale of the oil and
 gas extracted from the area covered by the lease or from the area
 covered by any other lease of state land or minerals held by the
 lessee, whether the proceeds are held by the lessee or another
 person, and all fixtures on and improvements to the area covered by
 the lease used in connection with the production or processing of
 the oil and gas, to secure the payment of royalties and other
 amounts due or to become due under the lease or this subchapter and
 to secure payment of damages or loss that the state may suffer by
 reason of the lessee's breach of a covenant or condition of the
 lease or of another lease of state land or minerals held by the
 lessee, whether express or implied.
 (b-1)  The commissioner shall determine whether to foreclose
 a lien established by Subsection (b) securing the payment of
 royalties and other amounts due or to become due under a lease or
 this subchapter and securing payment of damages or loss that the
 state may suffer by reason of the lessee's breach of a convenant or
 condition of the lease, whether express or implied, including the
 lien on all proceeds which may accrue to the lessee from the sale of
 the oil and gas extracted from the area covered by any other lease
 of state land or minerals held by the lessee.
 (b-2)  The commissioner shall determine the amount of a lien
 established by Subsection (b). The amount shall be based on the
 final audit billing notice, or similar order or notice, sent to the
 lessee and any penalty and interest that may have accrued after the
 date the final billing notice, or similar order or notice, was sent.
 (b-3)  The commissioner may adjust the amount of a lien
 established by Subsection (b) to account for the lessee's
 proportionate ownership interest in the lease.
 (d)  The commissioner may temporarily suspend enforcement of
 a lien established by Subsection (b) if the commissioner determines
 that, because of extenuating circumstances beyond the control of
 the lessee, the lessee did not receive payment from the first
 purchaser of the oil or gas produced from the lease area.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *