Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1832 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Patrick S.B. No. 1832
 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2009; March 20, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 April 14, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; April 14, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1832 By: Patrick


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the eligibility for judge-ordered community
 supervision or for release on parole or to mandatory supervision of
 a defendant convicted of criminal solicitation of capital murder.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (a), Section 3g, Article 42.12, Code
 of Criminal Procedure, as amended by Chapters 405 (S.B. 877) and 593
 (H.B. 8), Acts of the 80th Legislature, Regular Session, 2007, is
 reenacted and amended to read as follows:
 (a) The provisions of Section 3 of this article do not
 apply:
 (1) to a defendant adjudged guilty of an offense
 under:
 (A) Section 19.02, Penal Code (Murder);
 (B) Section 19.03, Penal Code (Capital murder);
 (C) Section 21.11(a)(1), Penal Code (Indecency
 with a child);
 (D) Section 20.04, Penal Code (Aggravated
 kidnapping);
 (E) Section 22.021, Penal Code (Aggravated
 sexual assault);
 (F) Section 29.03, Penal Code (Aggravated
 robbery);
 (G) Chapter 481, Health and Safety Code, for
 which punishment is increased under:
 (i) Section 481.140, Health and Safety
 Code; or
 (ii) Section 481.134(c), (d), (e), or (f),
 Health and Safety Code, if it is shown that the defendant has been
 previously convicted of an offense for which punishment was
 increased under any of those subsections;
 (H) Section 22.011, Penal Code (Sexual assault);
 [or]
 (I) Section 22.04(a)(1), Penal Code (Injury to a
 child, elderly individual, or disabled individual), if the offense
 is punishable as a felony of the first degree and the victim of the
 offense is a child; [or]
 (J) [(I)] Section 43.25, Penal Code (Sexual
 performance by a child); or
 (K)  Section 15.03, Penal Code, if the offense is
 punishable as a felony of the first degree; or
 (2) to a defendant when it is shown that a deadly
 weapon as defined in Section 1.07, Penal Code, was used or exhibited
 during the commission of a felony offense or during immediate
 flight therefrom, and that the defendant used or exhibited the
 deadly weapon or was a party to the offense and knew that a deadly
 weapon would be used or exhibited. On an affirmative finding under
 this subdivision, the trial court shall enter the finding in the
 judgment of the court. On an affirmative finding that the deadly
 weapon was a firearm, the court shall enter that finding in its
 judgment.
 SECTION 2. Subsection (d), Section 508.145, Government
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (d) An inmate serving a sentence for an offense described by
 Section 3g(a)(1)(A), (C), (D), (E), (F), (G), (H), [or] (I), (J), or
 (K), Article 42.12, Code of Criminal Procedure, or for an offense
 for which the judgment contains an affirmative finding under
 Section 3g(a)(2) of that article, is not eligible for release on
 parole until the inmate's actual calendar time served, without
 consideration of good conduct time, equals one-half of the sentence
 or 30 calendar years, whichever is less, but in no event is the
 inmate eligible for release on parole in less than two calendar
 years.
 SECTION 3. Subsection (a), Section 508.149, Government
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a) An inmate may not be released to mandatory supervision
 if the inmate is serving a sentence for or has been previously
 convicted of:
 (1) an offense for which the judgment contains an
 affirmative finding under Section 3g(a)(2), Article 42.12, Code of
 Criminal Procedure;
 (2) a first degree felony or a second degree felony
 under Section 19.02, Penal Code;
 (3) a capital felony under Section 19.03, Penal Code;
 (4) a first degree felony or a second degree felony
 under Section 20.04, Penal Code;
 (5) an offense under Section 21.11, Penal Code;
 (6) a felony under Section 22.011, Penal Code;
 (7) a first degree felony or a second degree felony
 under Section 22.02, Penal Code;
 (8) a first degree felony under Section 22.021, Penal
 Code;
 (9) a first degree felony under Section 22.04, Penal
 Code;
 (10) a first degree felony under Section 28.02, Penal
 Code;
 (11) a second degree felony under Section 29.02, Penal
 Code;
 (12) a first degree felony under Section 29.03, Penal
 Code;
 (13) a first degree felony under Section 30.02, Penal
 Code;
 (14) a felony for which the punishment is increased
 under Section 481.134 or Section 481.140, Health and Safety Code;
 (15) an offense under Section 43.25, Penal Code; [or]
 (16) an offense under Section 21.02, Penal Code; or
 (17)  a first degree felony under Section 15.03, Penal
 Code.
 SECTION 4. The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 covered by the law in effect when the offense was committed, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For purposes of
 this section, an offense was committed before the effective date of
 this Act if any element of the offense was committed before that
 date.
 SECTION 5. To the extent of any conflict, this Act prevails
 over another Act of the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009,
 relating to nonsubstantive additions to and corrections in enacted
 codes.
 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *