Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1833 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Patrick S.B. No. 1833
 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2009; March 20, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development;
 April 22, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 3,
 Nays 0; April 22, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to county participation in the enterprise zone program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subdivision (8), Section 2303.003, Government
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (8) "Qualified hotel project" means a hotel proposed
 to be constructed by a municipality, a county, or a nonprofit
 municipally sponsored or county-sponsored local government
 corporation created under the Texas Transportation Corporation
 Act, Chapter 431, Transportation Code, that is within 1,000 feet of
 a convention center owned by a municipality or county, as
 appropriate, having a population of 1,500,000 or more, including
 shops, parking facilities, and any other facilities ancillary to
 the hotel.
 SECTION 2. Subsection (a), Section 2303.505, Government
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a) To encourage the development of areas designated as
 enterprise zones, the governing body of a municipality or county
 through a program may refund its local sales and use taxes paid by a
 qualified business on all taxable items purchased for use at the
 qualified business site related to the project or activity.
 SECTION 3. Subsection (a), Section 2303.505, Government
 Code, as amended by this Act, applies only to the refund of local
 sales and use taxes paid on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *