By: Patrick S.B. No. 1837 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2009; March 20, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services; April 17, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 17, 2009, sent to printer.) A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the continuation of the Texas Bleeding Disorders Advisory Council. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 1, Chapter 994 (S.B. 1566), Acts of the 80th Legislature, Regular Session, 2007, is amended by adding Subsection (i-1) and amending Subsections (k) and (n) to read as follows: (i-1) The commissioner may accept on behalf of the council gifts, grants, and donations to fulfill the council's purposes under this section. (k) Not later than December 1 of each even-numbered year[, 2008], the council shall report on its findings and recommendations to the governor, the lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of representatives. The report shall be made public and is subject to public review and comment before it may be adopted by the council. (n) This section expires and the council is abolished September 1, 2013 [2009]. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2009. * * * * *