Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1861 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 81ST LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            April 14, 2009      TO: Honorable Royce West, Chair, Senate Committee on Intergovernmental Relations      FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:SB1861 by Ellis (Relating to certain programs and pilot programs administered by the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs.), As Introduced   Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for SB1861, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($4,000,000) through the biennium ending August 31, 2011. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. 

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 81ST LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 14, 2009





  TO: Honorable Royce West, Chair, Senate Committee on Intergovernmental Relations      FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:SB1861 by Ellis (Relating to certain programs and pilot programs administered by the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Royce West, Chair, Senate Committee on Intergovernmental Relations
FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: SB1861 by Ellis (Relating to certain programs and pilot programs administered by the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs.), As Introduced

 Honorable Royce West, Chair, Senate Committee on Intergovernmental Relations 

 Honorable Royce West, Chair, Senate Committee on Intergovernmental Relations 

 John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

SB1861 by Ellis (Relating to certain programs and pilot programs administered by the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs.), As Introduced

SB1861 by Ellis (Relating to certain programs and pilot programs administered by the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs.), As Introduced

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for SB1861, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($4,000,000) through the biennium ending August 31, 2011. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. 

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for SB1861, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($4,000,000) through the biennium ending August 31, 2011.

The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact to General Revenue Related Funds  2010 ($2,000,000)   2011 ($2,000,000)   2012 ($2,000,000)   2013 ($1,000,000)   2014 ($1,000,000)    


2010 ($2,000,000)
2011 ($2,000,000)
2012 ($2,000,000)
2013 ($1,000,000)
2014 ($1,000,000)

 All Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable (Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1    2010 ($2,000,000)   2011 ($2,000,000)   2012 ($2,000,000)   2013 ($1,000,000)   2014 ($1,000,000)   

  Fiscal Year Probable (Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1    2010 ($2,000,000)   2011 ($2,000,000)   2012 ($2,000,000)   2013 ($1,000,000)   2014 ($1,000,000)  


2010 ($2,000,000)
2011 ($2,000,000)
2012 ($2,000,000)
2013 ($1,000,000)
2014 ($1,000,000)

Fiscal Analysis

The bill would amend the Government Code relating to certain programs and pilot programs administered by the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs (TDHCA). The bill would direct TDHCA to establish a program that provides financial assistance for residential weatherization measures that do not qualify for the state's allocation of Federal Funds under the Low Income Home Energy Assistance Program (LIHEAP), Weatherization Assistance Progroam (WAP), or American Recovery and Reinvestment Act (ARRA) funds. The bill would direct TDHCA to work with the State Energy Conservation Office and the Energy Systems Laboratory at the Texas Engineering Experiment Station of the Texas A&M University System to identify cost-effective residential weatherization measures that allow persons to qualify for LIHEAP. The bill would also allow TDHCA to establish a pilot program to study the effectiveness of weatherization measures for increasing energy efficiency for individuals and families of low income, and report the findings by December 1, 2010.   This bill would take effect September 1, 2009.

The bill would amend the Government Code relating to certain programs and pilot programs administered by the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs (TDHCA). The bill would direct TDHCA to establish a program that provides financial assistance for residential weatherization measures that do not qualify for the state's allocation of Federal Funds under the Low Income Home Energy Assistance Program (LIHEAP), Weatherization Assistance Progroam (WAP), or American Recovery and Reinvestment Act (ARRA) funds.

The bill would direct TDHCA to work with the State Energy Conservation Office and the Energy Systems Laboratory at the Texas Engineering Experiment Station of the Texas A&M University System to identify cost-effective residential weatherization measures that allow persons to qualify for LIHEAP.

The bill would also allow TDHCA to establish a pilot program to study the effectiveness of weatherization measures for increasing energy efficiency for individuals and families of low income, and report the findings by December 1, 2010.  

This bill would take effect September 1, 2009.

Methodology

To develop this estimate, TDHCA surveyed eight WAP sub-recipients to determine the level of existing need for supplemental assistance as described in the bill. Based on this survey, the following assumptions were made: 5 percent of homes served through WAP would receive supplemental assistance; since the most common reason a house cannot be served is that the roof needs to be replaced, repairs funded would primarily be related to roof repair; roof repairs are typically about $5,000 per household. Based on these assumptions, TDHCA would limit supplemental assistance to $2,000 per home for fiscal years 2010-2012 and increase this to $5,000 per year from fiscal year 2013 forward.  Grant costs were therefore estimated as follows: Annual households served through federal Weatherization Assistance Program, fiscal years 2010-2012 calculated at 20,000 households per year X 5% = 1,000 homes X $2,000 per home = $2 million per year. For fiscal years 2013-2014, calculated at 4,000 household per year X 5% = 200 homes X $5,000 per home = $1 million per year. TDHCA also assumed that the program would be implemented using an existing online contract reporting system and that additional state administration would be minimal. It is assumed that the Texas Engineering Experiment Station and the State Energy Conservation Office could absorb the costs associated with the bill within current resources.

To develop this estimate, TDHCA surveyed eight WAP sub-recipients to determine the level of existing need for supplemental assistance as described in the bill. Based on this survey, the following assumptions were made: 5 percent of homes served through WAP would receive supplemental assistance; since the most common reason a house cannot be served is that the roof needs to be replaced, repairs funded would primarily be related to roof repair; roof repairs are typically about $5,000 per household. Based on these assumptions, TDHCA would limit supplemental assistance to $2,000 per home for fiscal years 2010-2012 and increase this to $5,000 per year from fiscal year 2013 forward.  Grant costs were therefore estimated as follows: Annual households served through federal Weatherization Assistance Program, fiscal years 2010-2012 calculated at 20,000 households per year X 5% = 1,000 homes X $2,000 per home = $2 million per year. For fiscal years 2013-2014, calculated at 4,000 household per year X 5% = 200 homes X $5,000 per home = $1 million per year. TDHCA also assumed that the program would be implemented using an existing online contract reporting system and that additional state administration would be minimal.

It is assumed that the Texas Engineering Experiment Station and the State Energy Conservation Office could absorb the costs associated with the bill within current resources.

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 332 Department of Housing and Community Affairs, 712 Texas Engineering Experiment Station

332 Department of Housing and Community Affairs, 712 Texas Engineering Experiment Station

LBB Staff: JOB, DB, MW, NV

 JOB, DB, MW, NV