Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1861 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Ellis S.B. No. 1861


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain programs and pilot programs administered by the
 Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter E, Chapter 2306, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Sections 2306.0971 and 2306.0972 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 2306.0971.  SUPPLEMENTAL ASSISTANCE PROGRAM FOR
 CERTAIN WEATHERIZATION-RELATED MEASURES. (a)  In addition to the
 Energy Services Program for Low-Income Individuals established
 under Section 2306.097, the department shall establish a program
 that provides financial assistance for residential
 weatherization-related measures that do not qualify for federal
 funds under the weatherization assistance program for low-income
 persons but that, if performed, would allow a person to receive that
 federal assistance.
 (b)  The department by rule shall establish eligibility
 criteria for a person to receive financial assistance for
 residential weatherization-related measures described by
 Subsection (a). The criteria must ensure that any
 weatherization-related measures performed will allow a person to
 receive federal assistance under the weatherization assistance
 program. The income criteria must be equivalent to the income
 criteria for a person to receive federal assistance under the
 weatherization assistance program.
 Sec. 2306.0972.  WEATHERIZATION PILOT PROGRAM. (a)  The
 department may establish a pilot program to study the effectiveness
 of weatherization measures in increasing residential energy
 efficiency for individuals and families of low income.
 (b)  If the department establishes a pilot program under this
 section, not later than December 1, 2010, the department shall
 submit a report to the legislature regarding its findings and
 recommendations under the pilot program.
 (c) This section expires September 1, 2011.
 SECTION 2. Subchapter K, Chapter 2306, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2306.260 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2306.260.  USE OF CERTAIN FEDERAL ASSISTANCE TO FUND
 PILOT PROGRAMS. The department may fund existing pilot programs or
 create new pilot programs as appropriate using federal supplemental
 appropriations under the American Recovery and Reinvestment Act of
 2009 (Pub. L. No. 111-5) or any other similar federal legislation
 that is enacted on or after January 1, 2009. This section expires
 December 31, 2011.
 SECTION 3. The Texas Department of Housing and Community
 Affairs shall adopt the rules required by Section 2306.0971,
 Government Code, as added by this Act, not later than December 1,
 2009.
 SECTION 4. This Act does not make an appropriation. A
 provision in this Act that creates a new governmental program,
 creates a new entitlement, or imposes a new duty on a governmental
 entity is not mandatory during a fiscal period for which the
 legislature has not made a specific appropriation to implement the
 provision.
 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.