Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1896 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Gallegos S.B. No. 1896
 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2009; March 24, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; April 15, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 4, Nays 0;
 April 15, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1896 By: Gallegos


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the grievance procedure for firefighters and police
 officers in certain municipalities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (a), Section 143.127, Local
 Government Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a) Except as otherwise provided by this subsection, a [A]
 fire fighter or police officer may file a grievance as provided by
 this subchapter[. The fire fighter or police officer may file a
 grievance] that relates to any aspect of the fire fighter's or
 police officer's employment covered by this chapter [the same
 aspects of the person's employment over which the civil service
 commission for the employees of the municipality who are not
 subject to this chapter would have lawful jurisdiction, including
 but not limited to a written or oral reprimand, transfers, job
 performance reviews, and job assignments]. The fire fighter or
 police officer may not file a grievance relating to:
 (1) a disciplinary suspension, indefinite suspension,
 promotional pass over, or demotion or other action or decision for
 which a hearing, review, or appeal is otherwise provided by this
 chapter; or
 (2) an allegation of discrimination based, in whole or
 in part, on race, color, religion, sex, or national origin.
 SECTION 2. Section 143.128, Local Government Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (f) to
 read as follows:
 (a) To begin a grievance action, a fire fighter or police
 officer must file a completed written step I grievance form with the
 person's department head or departmental grievance counselor
 within 30 days after the date the fire fighter or police officer
 knew or should have known of the action or inaction for which the
 person feels aggrieved occurred. A step I grievance form may be
 obtained from the departmental grievance counselor. If the form is
 not timely filed, the grievance is waived.
 (f)  If the supervisor does not provide the response required
 by Subsection (d) before the 16th day after the date the meeting
 occurs, the department head shall sustain the fire fighter's or
 police officer's grievance.
 SECTION 3. Section 143.129, Local Government Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (e) to read as follows:
 (e)  If the department head or the department head's
 representative does not provide the response required by Subsection
 (c) before the 16th day after the date the meeting occurs, the
 department head shall sustain the fire fighter's or police
 officer's grievance.
 SECTION 4. The changes in law made by this Act to Sections
 143.127, 143.128, and 143.129, Local Government Code, apply only to
 grievances filed on or after the effective date of this Act. A
 grievance filed before the effective date of this Act is governed by
 the law in effect on the date the grievance was filed, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *