Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1903 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hinojosa, Van de Putte S.B. No. 1903
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2009; March 24, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Veteran Affairs and
 Military Installations; April 17, 2009, reported favorably by the
 following vote: Yeas 4, Nays 0; April 17, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to creating a recognition day in honor of Vietnam
 veterans.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 662, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 662.058 to read as follows:
 Sec. 662.058.  VIETNAM VETERANS DAY.  (a)  March 29 is
 Vietnam Veterans Day in honor of the men and women who served in the
 Vietnam War on behalf of this nation.
 (b)  Vietnam Veterans Day shall be regularly observed by
 appropriate ceremonies.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *