Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1913 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Fraser S.B. No. 1913
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2009; March 24, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 April 24, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 24, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1913 By: Fraser


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certificates of convenience and necessity.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 37.051, Utilities Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (d), (e), and (f) to
 read as follows:
 (a) An electric utility or other person may not directly or
 indirectly provide service to the public under a franchise or
 permit unless the utility or other person first obtains from the
 commission a certificate that states that the public convenience
 and necessity requires or will require the installation, operation,
 or extension of the service.
 (d)  A certificate may be granted to an electric utility or
 other person under this section for a facility used as part of the
 transmission system serving the ERCOT power region solely for the
 transmission of electricity.
 (e)  The commission may consider an application filed by a
 person not currently certificated as an electric utility for a
 certificate of convenience and necessity to construct transmission
 capacity that serves the ERCOT power region. Before granting a
 certificate under this section, the commission must find, after
 notice and hearing, that:
 (1)  the applicant has the technical ability, financial
 ability, and sufficient resources in this state to own, operate,
 and maintain reliable transmission facilities;
 (2)  the applicant has the resources and ability to
 comply with commission rules, requirements of the independent
 organization certified under Section 39.151 for the ERCOT power
 region, and requirements of the National Electric Reliability
 Council applicable to the provisions of transmission service; and
 (3)  for an application filed by a person that is not an
 electric utility, granting the application will not adversely
 affect wholesale transmission rates, as compared to the rates
 projected to be charged if an existing electric utility were to
 build the transmission facility.
 (f)  The commission shall consider the requirements of
 Subsection (e) to have been met by an electric utility or other
 person that:
 (1)  is selected by the commission as a transmission
 provider under a plan adopted by the commission under Section
 39.904 not later than September 1, 2009; and
 (2)  before the certificate is issued, provides to the
 commission a detailed plan regarding the offices, personnel, and
 other resources the electric utility or other person will have in
 this state to ensure provision of continuous and adequate
 transmission service.
 SECTION 2. Subsection (a), Section 37.053, Utilities Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (a) An electric utility or other person that wants to obtain
 or amend a certificate must submit an application to the
 commission.
 SECTION 3. Sections 37.055, 37.057, and 37.151, Utilities
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 37.055. REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY ORDER. (a) An
 electric utility or other person that wants to exercise a right or
 privilege under a franchise or permit that the utility or other
 person anticipates obtaining but has not been granted may apply to
 the commission for a preliminary order under this section.
 (b) The commission may issue a preliminary order declaring
 that the commission, on application and under commission rules,
 will grant the requested certificate on terms the commission
 designates, after the electric utility or other person obtains the
 franchise or permit.
 (c) The commission shall grant the certificate on
 presentation of evidence satisfactory to the commission that the
 electric utility or other person has obtained the franchise or
 permit.
 Sec. 37.057. DEADLINE FOR APPLICATION FOR NEW TRANSMISSION
 FACILITY. The commission may grant a certificate for a new
 transmission facility to a qualified applicant that meets the
 requirements of this subchapter. The commission must approve or
 deny an application for a certificate for a new transmission
 facility not later than the first anniversary of the date the
 application is filed. If the commission does not approve or deny
 the application on or before that date, a party may seek a writ of
 mandamus in a district court of Travis County to compel the
 commission to decide on the application.
 Sec. 37.151. PROVISION OF SERVICE. Except as provided by
 this section, Section 37.152, and Section 37.153, a certificate
 holder, other than those granted a certificate under Section
 37.051(d), shall:
 (1) serve every consumer in the utility's certificated
 area; and
 (2) provide continuous and adequate service in that
 area.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *