Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1934 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Watson S.B. No. 1934
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2009; March 24, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development;
 April 8, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; April 8, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1934 By: Watson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of certain governmental entities to
 receive local sales tax information.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (c), Section 151.027, Tax Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (c) This section does not prohibit:
 (1) the examination of information, if authorized by
 the comptroller, by another state officer or law enforcement
 officer, by a tax official of another state, by a tax official of
 the United Mexican States, or by an official of the United States if
 a reciprocal agreement exists;
 (2) the delivery to a taxpayer, or a taxpayer's
 authorized representative, of a copy of a report or other paper
 filed by the taxpayer under this chapter;
 (3) the publication of statistics classified to
 prevent the identification of a particular report or items in a
 particular report;
 (4) the use of records, reports, or information
 secured, derived, or obtained by the attorney general or the
 comptroller in an action under this chapter against the same
 taxpayer who furnished the information;
 (5) the delivery to a successor, receiver, executor,
 administrator, assignee, or guarantor of a taxpayer of information
 about items included in the measure and amounts of any unpaid tax or
 amounts of tax, penalties, and interest required to be collected;
 (6) the delivery of information to an eligible
 municipality in accordance with Section 321.3022 or an eligible
 transit or transportation authority or emergency services district
 in accordance with Section 322.2022; or
 (7) the release of information in or derived from a
 record, report, or other instrument required to be furnished under
 this chapter by a governmental body, as that term is defined in
 Section 552.003, Government Code.
 SECTION 2. Subchapter C, Chapter 322, Tax Code, is amended
 by adding Section 322.2022 to read as follows:
 Sec. 322.2022.  TAX INFORMATION.  (a)  Except as otherwise
 provided by this section, the comptroller on request shall provide
 to a taxing entity that is a rapid transit authority created under
 Chapter 451, Transportation Code, a regional transportation
 authority created under Chapter 452, Transportation Code, or an
 emergency services district created under Chapter 775 or 776,
 Health and Safety Code, that has adopted a tax under the law
 authorizing the creation of the entity:
 (1)  information relating to the amount of tax paid to
 the entity under this chapter during the preceding or current
 calendar year by each person doing business in the area included in
 the entity who annually remits to the comptroller state and local
 sales tax payments of more than $25,000; and
 (2) any other information as provided by this section.
 (b)  The comptroller on request shall provide to a taxing
 entity to which this section applies information relating to the
 amount of tax paid to the entity under this chapter during the
 preceding or current calendar year by each person doing business in
 an area included in the entity, as defined by the entity, that is
 part of:
 (1) an interlocal agreement;
 (2) a revenue sharing agreement;
 (3)  any other agreement similar to those listed in
 Subdivisions (1) and (2); or
 (4)  any area defined by the entity for the purpose of
 economic forecasting.
 (c)  The comptroller shall provide the information under
 Subsection (b) as an aggregate total for all persons doing business
 in the defined area without disclosing individual tax payments.
 (d)  If the request for information under Subsection (b)
 involves not more than three persons doing business in the defined
 area who remit taxes under this chapter, the comptroller shall
 refuse to provide the information to the taxing entity unless the
 comptroller receives permission from each of the persons allowing
 the comptroller to provide the information to the entity as
 requested.
 (e)  A separate request for information under this section
 must be made in writing by the taxing entity each year.
 (f)  Information received by a taxing entity under this
 section is confidential, is not open to public inspection, and may
 be used only for the purpose of economic forecasting, for internal
 auditing of a tax paid to the entity under this chapter, or for the
 purpose described by Subsection (g).
 (g)  Information received by a taxing entity under
 Subsection (b) may be used by the entity to assist in determining
 revenue sharing under a revenue sharing agreement or other similar
 agreement.
 (h)  The comptroller may set and collect from a taxing entity
 reasonable fees to cover the expense of compiling and providing
 information under this section.
 (i)  Notwithstanding Chapter 551, Government Code, the
 governing body of a taxing entity is not required to confer with one
 or more employees or a third party in an open meeting to receive
 information or question the employees or third party regarding the
 information received by the entity under this section.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *