Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB194 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 194


 AN ACT
 relating to a prohibition against certain activities by a person
 employed in the financial aid office of a public institution of
 higher education or of a career school or college.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter Z, Chapter 51, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 51.9645 to read as follows:
 Sec. 51.9645.  PROHIBITION AGAINST CERTAIN ACTIVITIES BY
 FINANCIAL AID EMPLOYEES.  (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Institution of higher education" has the meaning
 assigned by Section 61.003.
 (2)  "Student loan" means a loan for which the loan
 agreement requires that all or part of the loan proceeds be used to
 assist a person in attending an institution of higher education or
 other postsecondary institution.
 (3)  "Student loan lender" means a person whose primary
 business is:
 (A)  making, brokering, arranging, or accepting
 applications for student loans; or
 (B)  a combination of activities described by
 Paragraph (A).
 (b)  A person employed by an institution of higher education
 in the financial aid office of the institution may not:
 (1)  own stock or hold another ownership interest in a
 student loan lender, other than through ownership of shares in a
 publicly traded mutual fund or similar investment vehicle in which
 the person does not exercise any discretion regarding the
 investment of the assets of the fund or other investment vehicle; or
 (2)  solicit or accept any gift from a student loan
 lender.
 (c)  A person who violates this section is subject to
 dismissal or other appropriate disciplinary action.
 SECTION 2. Subchapter F, Chapter 132, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 132.158 to read as follows:
 Sec. 132.158.  PROHIBITION AGAINST CERTAIN ACTIVITIES BY
 FINANCIAL AID EMPLOYEES. (a) In this section:
 (1)  "Student loan" means a loan for which the loan
 agreement requires that all or part of the loan proceeds be used to
 assist a person in attending an institution of higher education or
 other postsecondary institution, including a career school or
 college.
 (2)  "Student loan lender" means a person whose primary
 business is:
 (A)  making, brokering, arranging, or accepting
 applications for student loans; or
 (B)  a combination of activities described by
 Paragraph (A).
 (b)  A person employed by a career school or college in the
 financial aid office of the school or college may not:
 (1)  own stock or hold another ownership interest in a
 student loan lender, other than through ownership of shares in a
 publicly traded mutual fund or similar investment vehicle in which
 the person does not exercise any discretion regarding the
 investment of the assets of the fund or other investment vehicle; or
 (2)  solicit or accept any gift from a student loan
 lender.
 (c)  A career school or college may not knowingly employ a
 person who violates Subsection (b).  If a career school or college
 discovers that its employee is in violation of Subsection (b), the
 school or college shall promptly take appropriate action to cure
 the violation, including appropriate disciplinary action, based on
 the severity of the violation and whether the violation was
 inadvertent.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 194 passed the Senate on
 April 2, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 30, 2009, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 194 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 148,
 Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor