Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1953 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Jackson S.B. No. 1953
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2009; March 24, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 April 24, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 4, Nays 0; April 24, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1953 By: Whitmire


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to authorizing the transfer of certain real property held
 by the Texas Department of Criminal Justice.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. AUTHORIZATION FOR TRANSFER. (a) Not later than
 January 1, 2010, the Texas Department of Criminal Justice shall
 transfer to Brazoria County the real property specified in Section
 2 of this Act.
 (b) Consideration for the transfer authorized by Subsection
 (a) of this section shall be in the form of an agreement between the
 parties that requires Brazoria County to use the property in a
 manner that primarily promotes a public purpose that benefits the
 public interest of the state.
 (c) If Brazoria County fails to use the property in the
 manner described by an agreement under Subsection (b) of this
 section for more than 180 continuous days, ownership of the
 property automatically reverts to the Texas Department of Criminal
 Justice.
 (d) The Texas Department of Criminal Justice shall transfer
 the property to Brazoria County by an appropriate instrument of
 transfer. The instrument of transfer must include a provision
 that:
 (1) requires Brazoria County to use the property in a
 manner that primarily promotes a public purpose that benefits the
 public interest of the state; and
 (2) indicates that ownership of the property
 automatically reverts to the Texas Department of Criminal Justice
 if Brazoria County no longer uses the property in a manner that
 primarily promotes a public purpose that benefits the public
 interest of the state.
 SECTION 2. PROPERTY DESCRIPTION. The Texas Department of
 Criminal Justice property to be transferred as provided by Section
 1 of this Act consists of approximately 332 acres, more or less,
 being part of that 7,424.4 tract or parcel of land conveyed to the
 Prison Commission of the State of Texas as recorded in Book 145,
 Page 242 of the Deed Records Brazoria County, Texas, said 332 acres,
 more or less, being out of the Jared E. Groce grant in Brazoria
 County, Texas, near Angleton, Texas, bounded by the Brazoria County
 Airport property to the West and State Highway 288 to the East, the
 northern boundary being the northern boundary of the said 7,424.4
 tract or parcel of land, the southern boundary being the northern
 boundary of a tract or parcel of land conveyed to RH Retrieve, Ltd.
 as recorded as Document # 2007018866 in the Official Public Records
 of Brazoria County, Texas.
 SECTION 3. AUTHORIZATION FOR TRANSFER. (a) Not later than
 October 31, 2010, the Texas Department of Criminal Justice shall
 transfer to the City of Houston the real property specified in
 Section 4 of this Act, including any improvements affixed to the
 property.
 (b) Consideration for the transfer authorized by Subsection
 (a) of this section shall be in the form of an agreement between the
 parties that requires the City of Houston to use the property in a
 manner that primarily promotes a public purpose that benefits the
 public interest of the state.
 (c) If the City of Houston fails to use the property in the
 manner described by an agreement under Subsection (b) of this
 section for more than 180 continuous days, ownership of the
 property automatically reverts to the Texas Department of Criminal
 Justice.
 (d) The Texas Department of Criminal Justice shall transfer
 the property to the City of Houston by an appropriate instrument of
 transfer. The instrument of transfer must include a provision
 that:
 (1) requires the City of Houston to use the property in
 a manner that primarily promotes a public purpose that benefits the
 public interest of the state; and
 (2) indicates that ownership of the property
 automatically reverts to the Texas Department of Criminal Justice
 if the City of Houston no longer uses the property in a manner that
 primarily promotes a public purpose that benefits the public
 interest of the state.
 SECTION 4. PROPERTY DESCRIPTION. The Texas Department of
 Criminal Justice property to be transferred as provided by Section
 3 of this Act is described as follows:
 Being a tract or parcel containing 0.0204 acre (888 square
 feet) of land situated in the H. Reinerman Survey, Abstract Number
 644, City of Houston, Harris County, Texas, being out of and a part
 of Tract 1, Block 2 of BROOKHOLLOW/HOUSTON, SECTION ONE, a
 subdivision of record in Volume 144, Page 79, Harris County Map
 Records (H.C.M.R.), out of and a part of Tract 2, Block 2 of
 BROOKHOLLOW/HOUSTON, SECTION TWO, a subdivision of record in Volume
 148, Page 33, H.C.M.R., and being out of and a part of a called
 197,847 square foot tract conveyed to the State of Texas Department
 of Public Safety (State of Texas) by deed recorded under Harris
 County Clerks File (H.C.C.F.) Number C580248, said 0.0204 acre
 tract being more particularly described as follows (bearings are
 oriented to the bearing base reflected in the record plat of said
 BROOKHOLLOW/HOUSTON, SECTION ONE):
 BEGINNING at a mag nail found marking the easterly corner of a
 called 0.0650 acre tract conveyed to the City of Houston by deed
 recorded under H.C.C.F. Number X311063, said nail marking the
 northerly corner of the herein described tract;
 THENCE, South 4454'53" East, over and across said 197,847
 square foot tract, a distance of 17.50 feet to a PK Nail set marking
 the easterly corner of the herein described tract
 THENCE, South 4505'07" West, over and across said 197,847
 square foot tract, a distance of 50.75 feet to a PK Nail set marking
 the southerly corner of the herein described tract;
 THENCE, North 4454'53" West, over and across said 197,847
 square foot tract, a distance of 17.50 feet to a Mag Nail found
 marking the southerly corner of said 0.0650 acre tract and marking
 the westerly corner of the herein described tract;
 THENCE, North 4505'07" East, along the southeasterly line of
 said 0.0650 acre tract, a distance of 50.75 feet to the POINT OF
 BEGINNING and containing 0.204 acre (888 square feet) of land.
 SECTION 5. EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect September
 1, 2009.
 * * * * *