Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1958 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Van de Putte S.B. No. 1958
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2009; March 24, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Government Organization;
 April 7, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 6,
 Nays 0; April 7, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to including certain veterans service organizations as
 small businesses for the purpose of state contracting.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (a), Section 2155.505, Government
 Code, is amended by amending Subdivision (2) and adding Subdivision
 (3) to read as follows:
 (2) "Small business" means a small business concern as
 defined by regulations of the United States Small Business
 Administration in 13 C.F.R. Section 121.201 or a veterans service
 agency.
 (3)  "Veterans service agency" means a community-based
 organization that:
 (A)  is exempt from taxation under Section 501(a),
 Internal Revenue Code of 1986, as an organization described in
 Section 501(c)(3) of that code; and
 (B)  has as its principal purpose to provide
 housing, substance abuse treatment, case management services, and
 employment training to low-income veterans, disabled veterans, and
 homeless veterans and their families.
 SECTION 2. Subsection (a), Section 2155.505, Government
 Code, as amended by this Act, applies only to a contract for the
 procurement of goods and services for which the solicitation of
 bids or proposals, request for proposals, or similar required
 notification as to the goods or services is published on or after
 September 1, 2009. A contract for the procurement of goods and
 services for which the solicitation of bids or proposals, request
 for proposals, or similar required notification as to the goods or
 services is published before September 1, 2009, is governed by the
 law in effect at the time the solicitation, request, or
 notification is published, and that law is continued in effect for
 that purpose.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *