Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1967 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Carona S.B. No. 1967
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2009; March 24, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Homeland
 Security; April 14, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 April 14, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1967 By: Carona


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the safe operation of motorcycles and other vehicles in
 this state; providing penalties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter H, Chapter 201, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 201.621 to read as follows:
 Sec. 201.621.  MOTORCYCLIST SAFETY AND SHARE THE ROAD
 CAMPAIGN.  From funds appropriated for that purpose, the department
 shall conduct a continuing public awareness campaign to promote
 motorcyclist safety and the concept of sharing the road with
 motorcyclists.
 SECTION 2. Subchapter G, Chapter 521, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 521.148 to read as follows:
 Sec. 521.148.  APPLICATION FOR CLASS M LICENSE OR
 AUTHORIZATION TO OPERATE MOTORCYCLE. (a)  An applicant for an
 original Class M license or Class A, B, or C driver's license that
 includes an authorization to operate a motorcycle must furnish to
 the department evidence satisfactory to the department that the
 applicant has successfully completed a basic motorcycle operator
 training course approved by the department under Chapter 662.
 (b)  The department may not issue an original Class M license
 or Class A, B, or C driver's license that includes an authorization
 to operate a motorcycle to an applicant who fails to comply with
 Subsection (a).
 (c)  When the department issues a license to which this
 section applies, the department shall provide the person to whom
 the license is issued with written information about the Glenda
 Dawson Donate Life-Texas Registry program established under
 Chapter 49, Health and Safety Code.
 SECTION 3. Subchapter C, Chapter 522, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 522.034 to read as follows:
 Sec. 522.034.  APPLICATION FOR AUTHORIZATION TO OPERATE
 MOTORCYCLE. (a)  An applicant for an original commercial driver's
 license or commercial driver learner's permit that includes an
 authorization to operate a motorcycle must furnish to the
 department evidence satisfactory to the department that the
 applicant has successfully completed a basic motorcycle operator
 training course approved by the department under Chapter 662.
 (b)  The department may not issue an original commercial
 driver's license or commercial driver learner's permit that
 includes an authorization to operate a motorcycle to an applicant
 who fails to comply with Subsection (a).
 (c)  When the department issues a license or permit to which
 this section applies, the department shall provide the person to
 whom the license is issued with written information about the
 Glenda Dawson Donate Life-Texas Registry program established under
 Chapter 49, Health and Safety Code.
 SECTION 4. Subchapter D, Chapter 542, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 542.4045 to read as follows:
 Sec. 542.4045.  PENALTIES FOR FAILURE TO YIELD RIGHT-OF-WAY
 OFFENSE RESULTING IN ACCIDENT. If it is shown on the trial of an
 offense under this subtitle in which an element is the failure by
 the operator of a vehicle to yield the right-of-way to another
 vehicle that an accident resulted from the operator's failure to
 yield the right-of-way:
 (1)  the offense is a Class B misdemeanor with a minimum
 fine of $500, if a person other than the operator of the vehicle
 suffered bodily injury in the accident; and
 (2)  the offense is a Class A misdemeanor with a minimum
 fine of $1,000, if a person other than the operator of the vehicle
 suffered serious bodily injury in the accident.
 SECTION 5. Section 661.003, Transportation Code, is amended
 by amending Subsection (c) and adding Subsections (c-1) and (c-2)
 to read as follows:
 (c) It is an exception to the application of Subsection (a)
 or (b) that at the time the offense was committed, the person
 required to wear protective headgear was at least 21 years old and
 had successfully completed a motorcycle operator training and
 safety course under Chapter 662 or was covered by a health insurance
 plan providing the person with [at least $10,000 in] medical
 benefits for injuries incurred as a result of an accident while
 operating or riding on a motorcycle. A peace officer may not arrest
 a person or issue a citation to a person for a violation of
 Subsection (a) or (b) if the person required to wear protective
 headgear is at least 21 years of age and presents evidence
 sufficient to show that the person required to wear protective
 headgear has successfully completed a motorcycle operator training
 and safety course or is covered by a health insurance plan as
 described by this subsection.
 (c-1)  A peace officer may not stop or detain a person who is
 the operator of or a passenger on a motorcycle for the sole purpose
 of determining whether the person has successfully completed the
 motorcycle operator training and safety course or is covered by a
 health insurance plan.
 (c-2)  The Texas Department of Insurance shall prescribe a
 standard proof of health insurance for issuance to persons who are
 at least 21 years of age and covered by a health insurance plan
 described by Subsection (c).
 SECTION 6. Subsection (a), Section 662.011, Transportation
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a) Of each fee collected under Sections 521.421(b) and (f)
 and[,] Sections 522.029(f) and (g), [and Section 661.003(d),] the
 Department of Public Safety shall send $5 to the comptroller for
 deposit to the credit of the motorcycle education fund account.
 SECTION 7. Subchapter C, Chapter 1001, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 1001.1025 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1001.1025.  MOTORCYCLE AWARENESS INFORMATION.
 (a)  The agency by rule shall require that information relating to
 motorcycle awareness, the dangers of failing to yield the
 right-of-way to a motorcyclist, and the need to share the road with
 motorcyclists be included in the curriculum of any driver education
 course or driving safety course.
 (b)  In developing rules under this section, the agency shall
 consult with the department.
 SECTION 8. Subsections (d), (e), (f), and (g), Section
 661.003, Transportation Code, are repealed.
 SECTION 9. The change in law made by this Act to Chapters
 521 and 522, Transportation Code, apply only in connection with an
 application for a driver's license, personal identification
 certificate, commercial driver's license, or commercial driver
 learner's permit filed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An application for a driver's license, personal identification
 certificate, commercial driver's license, or commercial driver
 learner's permit filed before the effective date of this Act is
 covered by the law in effect when the application was filed, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 10. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *