Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1983 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Uresti S.B. No. 1983
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2009; March 24, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services;
 April 22, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 22, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the regulation of employer-based day-care facilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subdivision (2), Section 42.151, Human Resources
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (2) "Small employer" means a corporation,
 partnership, sole proprietorship, or other legal entity that
 employs fewer than 100 [50] full-time employees.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *