Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1984 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Uresti S.B. No. 1984
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2009; March 24, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Homeland
 Security; May 7, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0;
 May 7, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1984 By: Nichols


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certification of a person in certain counties as
 eligible for disabled parking privileges.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 681.003, Transportation Code, is amended
 by amending Subsection (c) and adding Subsection (f) to read as
 follows:
 (c) Subject to Subsections [Subsection] (e) and (f), the
 first application must be accompanied by a notarized written
 statement or written prescription of a physician licensed to
 practice medicine in this state or a state adjacent to this state,
 or authorized by applicable law to practice medicine in a hospital
 or other health facility of the United States Department of
 Veterans Affairs [Administration], certifying and providing
 evidence acceptable to the department that the person making the
 application or on whose behalf the application is made is legally
 blind or has a mobility problem that substantially impairs the
 person's ability to ambulate. The statement or prescription must
 include a certification of whether the disability is temporary or
 permanent and information acceptable to the department to determine
 the type of disabled parking placard for which the applicant is
 eligible. The department shall determine a person's eligibility
 based on evidence provided by the applicant establishing legal
 blindness or mobility impairment.
 (f)  This subsection applies only to the first application
 for a disabled parking placard submitted by a person who resides in
 a county with a population of 125,000 or less. The notarized
 written statement or prescription may be issued by:
 (1)  a person acting under the delegation and
 supervision of a licensed physician in conformance with Subchapter
 B, Chapter 157, Occupations Code; or
 (2)  a physician assistant licensed to practice in this
 state acting as the agent of a licensed physician under Section
 204.202(e), Occupations Code.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *