Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2015 House Committee Report / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 81ST LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            May 11, 2009      TO: Honorable Joseph Pickett, Chair, House Committee on Transportation      FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:SB2015 by Watson (Relating to certain metropolitan rapid transit authorities.), Committee Report 2nd House, Substituted   Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for SB2015, Committee Report 2nd House, Substituted: an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2011. 

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 81ST LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
May 11, 2009





  TO: Honorable Joseph Pickett, Chair, House Committee on Transportation      FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:SB2015 by Watson (Relating to certain metropolitan rapid transit authorities.), Committee Report 2nd House, Substituted  

TO: Honorable Joseph Pickett, Chair, House Committee on Transportation
FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: SB2015 by Watson (Relating to certain metropolitan rapid transit authorities.), Committee Report 2nd House, Substituted

 Honorable Joseph Pickett, Chair, House Committee on Transportation 

 Honorable Joseph Pickett, Chair, House Committee on Transportation 

 John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

SB2015 by Watson (Relating to certain metropolitan rapid transit authorities.), Committee Report 2nd House, Substituted

SB2015 by Watson (Relating to certain metropolitan rapid transit authorities.), Committee Report 2nd House, Substituted

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for SB2015, Committee Report 2nd House, Substituted: an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2011. 

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for SB2015, Committee Report 2nd House, Substituted: an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2011.

General Revenue-Related Funds, Six-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact to General Revenue Related Funds  2010 $0   2011 $0   2012 $0   2013 $0   2014 $0   2015 $0    


2010 $0
2011 $0
2012 $0
2013 $0
2014 $0
2015 $0

 All Funds, Six-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1  Probable Revenue Gain/(Loss) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1  Probable Revenue Gain/(Loss) fromCapital Metropolitan Transportation Authority Change in Number of State Employees from FY 2009   2010 ($194,569) $194,569 ($194,569) 3.0   2011 ($194,569) $194,569 ($194,569) 3.0   2012 $0 $0 $0 0.0   2013 $0 $0 $0 0.0   2014 $0 $0 $0 0.0   2015 ($194,569) $194,569 ($194,569) 3.0   

  Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1  Probable Revenue Gain/(Loss) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1  Probable Revenue Gain/(Loss) fromCapital Metropolitan Transportation Authority Change in Number of State Employees from FY 2009   2010 ($194,569) $194,569 ($194,569) 3.0   2011 ($194,569) $194,569 ($194,569) 3.0   2012 $0 $0 $0 0.0   2013 $0 $0 $0 0.0   2014 $0 $0 $0 0.0   2015 ($194,569) $194,569 ($194,569) 3.0  


2010 ($194,569) $194,569 ($194,569) 3.0
2011 ($194,569) $194,569 ($194,569) 3.0
2012 $0 $0 $0 0.0
2013 $0 $0 $0 0.0
2014 $0 $0 $0 0.0
2015 ($194,569) $194,569 ($194,569) 3.0

Fiscal Analysis

The bill would amend the Transportation Code as it relates to the Capital Metropolitan Transportation Authority in Austin (Cap Metro). Included would be requirements related to the effective date of establishment of or a change to fares, tolls, charges, rents, and other compensation by Cap Metro; balloting on funding the system and expanding the system; internal audits; reports to the principal municipality and county which Cap Metro serves; and membership of the Cap Metro board. The bill would require that the Sunset Advisory Commission review Cap Metro as if it was scheduled to be abolished September 1, 2011, and again as if it was scheduled to be abolished September 1, 2016. Cap Metro would be required to pay the costs incurred for the commission to conduct the reviews. The bill would take effect September 1, 2009.

The bill would amend the Transportation Code as it relates to the Capital Metropolitan Transportation Authority in Austin (Cap Metro). Included would be requirements related to the effective date of establishment of or a change to fares, tolls, charges, rents, and other compensation by Cap Metro; balloting on funding the system and expanding the system; internal audits; reports to the principal municipality and county which Cap Metro serves; and membership of the Cap Metro board.

The bill would require that the Sunset Advisory Commission review Cap Metro as if it was scheduled to be abolished September 1, 2011, and again as if it was scheduled to be abolished September 1, 2016. Cap Metro would be required to pay the costs incurred for the commission to conduct the reviews.

The bill would take effect September 1, 2009.

Methodology

According to the Sunset Advisory Commission, the agency would need three additional full-time-equivalent positions in each year in which the reviews are conducted: fiscal years 2010, 2011, and 2015 (although there would be costs incurred in fiscal year 2016, this analysis covers only the first six years of implementation). The commission would also incur production costs to print and distribute reports containing the commission's recommendations. All cost estimates are based on historical costs related to similar sized reviews. As required by provisions of the bill, the commission would be reimbursed its costs by Cap Metro.

According to the Sunset Advisory Commission, the agency would need three additional full-time-equivalent positions in each year in which the reviews are conducted: fiscal years 2010, 2011, and 2015 (although there would be costs incurred in fiscal year 2016, this analysis covers only the first six years of implementation). The commission would also incur production costs to print and distribute reports containing the commission's recommendations. All cost estimates are based on historical costs related to similar sized reviews. As required by provisions of the bill, the commission would be reimbursed its costs by Cap Metro.

Local Government Impact

The costs to Cap Metro are shown in the above tables.

Source Agencies: 116 Sunset Advisory Commission

116 Sunset Advisory Commission

LBB Staff: JOB, KJG, SD, DB

 JOB, KJG, SD, DB