Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2017 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Watson S.B. No. 2017
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2009; March 24, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Homeland
 Security; April 16, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 April 16, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2017 By: Watson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to public participation in the development of
 transportation projects by the Texas Department of Transportation.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter H, Chapter 201, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 201.605 to read as follows:
 Sec. 201.605.  PUBLIC PARTICIPATION. (a)  The commission by
 rule shall provide for the department to hold, or provide the
 opportunity for, one or more public hearings for any transportation
 project owned or operated by the department that requires the
 acquisition of significant amounts of rights-of-way, substantially
 changes the layout or functions of connecting roadways or of a
 facility being improved, has a substantial adverse impact on
 abutting property, or otherwise has a significant social, economic,
 environmental, or other effect, or for which the department
 determines that a public hearing is in the public interest. The
 rules must provide for the public's submission of oral or written
 comments and the department's preparation of written responses to
 the comments. The department shall prepare a transcript of any oral
 comments submitted.
 (b)  The commission by rule shall provide for the department
 to hold, or provide the opportunity for, one or more public meetings
 for an informal exchange of information between the department and
 the public for a transportation project owned or operated by the
 department. The rules must provide for the public meetings to be
 held at the earliest stages of the project as possible.
 (c)  Notice of a public hearing or a public meeting under
 this section must:
 (1)  be by publication in the locality of the
 transportation project not less than seven or more than 20 days
 before the date of the hearing or meeting;
 (2)  be distributed to the public not less than seven
 days before the date of the hearing or meeting using methods
 suitable for the distribution given the nature of the
 transportation project and the populations that may be affected by
 it;
 (3) be simple, readable, and informative;
 (4) include:
 (A) the name and description of the project;
 (B) a map or graphic illustration of the project;
 (C) the reason for the project;
 (D) the purpose of the hearing or meeting;
 (E)  the location, date, and time of the hearing
 or meeting;
 (F)  a contact telephone number for information
 about the hearing or meeting; and
 (G)  the Internet website address where project
 information and the materials used at the hearing or meeting may be
 viewed; and
 (5)  if the population that will be affected by the
 project is significantly non-English-speaking, also be published
 in the dominant language of a majority of that population.
 (d)  Any interested person may attend a public hearing or a
 public meeting held under this section.
 (e)  The department shall publish on its Internet website any
 materials used at a public hearing or public meeting not later than
 the third day after the date of the hearing or meeting.
 (f)  If the department holds more than one public hearing or
 one public meeting for a transportation project, the department
 shall vary the scheduling of the hearings or meetings to
 accommodate persons living in different geographic areas affected
 by the project and persons with varied work schedules.
 (g)  The department's presentation of information at a
 public hearing or meeting must include:
 (1) the design and schematic layout of the project;
 (2) the problem or need to be addressed by the project;
 (3)  a reference to the part of the department's
 mission, strategic plan, or legislative direction that is furthered
 by the project, and the project's relation to the local planning
 process;
 (4)  an explanation using diagrams, flowcharts, or
 other devices to illustrate procedural steps of the project, and an
 estimated timeline leading to the completion of the project; and
 (5)  a discussion of significant impacts of the
 project.
 (h)  The department shall make available an electronic mail
 address or Internet website that may be used to submit public
 comments concerning a project.
 (i)  The commission by rule shall provide owners of adjoining
 property and affected local governments and public officials with
 notice and an opportunity for comment on a state highway project
 that involves:
 (1)  the addition of one or more vehicular lanes to an
 existing highway; or
 (2) the construction of a highway at a new location.
 (j)  The commission by rule shall provide procedures for
 informing adjoining property owners and affected local governments
 and public officials of impending construction.
 SECTION 2. Subchapter B, Chapter 203, Transportation Code,
 is repealed.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect January 1, 2010.
 * * * * *