Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2018 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Watson S.B. No. 2018
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2009; March 24, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Homeland
 Security; April 22, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0;
 April 22, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2018 By: Watson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to neighborhood vehicles and golf carts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 502.001, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subdivision (14-a) to read as follows:
 (14-a)  "Neighborhood vehicle" means a golf cart
 operated in accordance with Section 551.303, a vehicle subject to
 Federal Motor Vehicle Safety Standard 500 (49 C.F.R. Section
 571.500), or a motor vehicle that is designed to carry persons or
 property and to travel more than 10 but not more than 35 miles per
 hour and that is designated as a neighborhood vehicle by the
 department. The term does not include an all-terrain vehicle, farm
 tractor, implement of husbandry, or road tractor.
 SECTION 2. Section 502.0071, Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 502.0071. GOLF CARTS. (a) An owner of a golf cart is
 not required to title or register the golf cart if:
 (1) the operation of the golf cart occurs in the
 daytime, as defined by Section 541.401; and
 (2) the operation:
 (A) [does not exceed a distance of two miles from
 the point of origin to the destination if driven to and from a golf
 course;
 [(B)] occurs entirely within a master planned
 community with a uniform set of restrictive covenants that has had a
 plat approved by a county or a municipality; or
 (B) [(C)] occurs on a public or private beach.
 (b)  An owner of a golf cart may title and register the golf
 cart as a neighborhood vehicle.
 SECTION 3. Subchapter A, Chapter 502, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 502.0076 to read as follows:
 Sec. 502.0076.  OPERATION OF NEIGHBORHOOD VEHICLE ON STREET
 OR HIGHWAY. An owner shall register a neighborhood vehicle before
 operating the vehicle on a street or highway. This section does not
 authorize the operation of a neighborhood vehicle on a public road
 on which operation of the vehicle is otherwise prohibited by law.
 SECTION 4. Subchapter D, Chapter 502, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 502.169 to read as follows:
 Sec. 502.169.  FEE:  NEIGHBORHOOD VEHICLE. The fee for
 registration of a neighborhood vehicle is $30.
 SECTION 5. The heading to Section 504.510, Transportation
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 504.510. NEIGHBORHOOD VEHICLE [GOLF CART] LICENSE
 PLATES.
 SECTION 6. Subsection (a), Section 504.510, Transportation
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a) The department shall issue specialty license plates for
 an eligible neighborhood vehicle [golf cart].
 SECTION 7. Section 547.001, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subdivision (5-a) to read as follows:
 (5-a)  "Neighborhood vehicle" has the meaning assigned
 by Section 502.001.
 SECTION 8. Section 547.002, Transportation Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 547.002. APPLICABILITY. Unless a provision is
 specifically made applicable, this chapter and the rules of the
 department adopted under this chapter do not apply to:
 (1) an implement of husbandry;
 (2) road machinery;
 (3) a road roller;
 (4) a farm tractor;
 (5) a bicycle, a bicyclist, or bicycle equipment;
 (6) an electric bicycle, an electric bicyclist, or
 electric bicycle equipment; or
 (7) a golf cart not required to be registered because
 it is only operated in the manner described by [under] Section
 502.0071 [502.284].
 SECTION 9. The heading to Section 547.703, Transportation
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 547.703. ADDITIONAL EQUIPMENT REQUIREMENTS FOR
 SLOW-MOVING AND NEIGHBORHOOD VEHICLES.
 SECTION 10. Subsection (d), Section 547.703,
 Transportation Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (d) A neighborhood vehicle that can attain a maximum speed
 of 25 miles per hour or less on a paved level surface [golf cart as
 defined by Section 502.001] is required to display a
 slow-moving-vehicle emblem [only] when [it is] operated on a [an
 arterial] street or highway.
 SECTION 11. Section 548.051, Transportation Code, is
 amended by adding Subsections (c) and (d) to read as follows:
 (c)  Except as provided in Subsection (d), a neighborhood
 vehicle registered in this state must have the following items
 inspected at an inspection station or by an inspector:
 (1) headlamps;
 (2) rear lamps;
 (3) reflectors;
 (4) parking brake; and
 (5) mirrors.
 (d)  Notwithstanding Subsection (c), a neighborhood vehicle
 that is subject to Federal Motor Vehicle Safety Standard 500 (49
 C.F.R. Section 571.500) also must comply with those equipment
 standards.
 SECTION 12. The heading to Subchapter D, Chapter 551,
 Transportation Code, is amended to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER D. NEIGHBORHOOD [ELECTRIC] VEHICLES
 SECTION 13. Subdivision (1), Section 551.301,
 Transportation Code, as amended by Chapter 281 (H.B. 2702), Acts of
 the 79th Legislature, Regular Session, 2005, is amended to read as
 follows:
 (1) "Neighborhood [electric] vehicle" has the meaning
 assigned by Section 502.001 [means a vehicle subject to Federal
 Motor Vehicle Safety Standard 500 (49 C.F.R. Section 571.500)].
 SECTION 14. Section 551.302, Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 551.302. REGISTRATION. The Texas Department of
 Transportation may adopt rules relating to the registration and
 issuance of license plates to neighborhood [electric] vehicles.
 SECTION 15. Section 551.303, Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 551.303. OPERATION ON ROADWAYS. (a) An owner shall
 register a neighborhood vehicle under Section 502.0076 before
 operating the vehicle on a street or highway. A neighborhood
 [electric] vehicle may be operated only on a street or highway for
 which the posted speed limit is 35 miles per hour or less. A
 neighborhood [electric] vehicle may cross a road or street [at an
 intersection] where the [road or street has a] posted speed limit is
 [of] more than 35 miles per hour only at an intersection.
 (b) A county or municipality may prohibit the operation of a
 neighborhood [electric] vehicle on a street or highway if the
 governing body of the county or municipality determines that the
 prohibition is necessary in the interest of safety.
 (c) The Texas Department of Transportation may prohibit the
 operation of a neighborhood [electric] vehicle on a public highway,
 as defined by Section 502.001, if that department determines that
 the prohibition is necessary in the interest of safety.
 (d)  The owner of a neighborhood vehicle shall comply with
 the licensing requirement of Chapter 521, and the requirements of
 Chapters 547 and 548, as applicable.
 SECTION 16. Subsection (a), Section 601.052,
 Transportation Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a) Section 601.051 does not apply to:
 (1) the operation of a motor vehicle that:
 (A) is a former military vehicle or is at least 25
 years old;
 (B) is used only for exhibitions, club
 activities, parades, and other functions of public interest and not
 for regular transportation; and
 (C) for which the owner files with the department
 an affidavit, signed by the owner, stating that the vehicle is a
 collector's item and used only as described by Paragraph (B);
 (2) the operation of a golf cart not required to be
 registered because it is only operated in the manner described by
 [under] Section 502.0071 [502.284]; or
 (3) a volunteer fire department for the operation of a
 motor vehicle the title of which is held in the name of a volunteer
 fire department.
 SECTION 17. The following provisions of the Transportation
 Code are repealed:
 (1) Subsections (b), (c), and (d), Section 504.510;
 (2) Subsection (e), Section 547.703;
 (3) Section 551.301, as amended by Chapter 1242 (H.B.
 1596), Acts of the 79th Legislature, Regular Session, 2005; and
 (4) Subdivision (2), Section 551.301, as amended by
 Chapter 281 (H.B. 2702), Acts of the 79th Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2005.
 SECTION 18. This Act takes effect immediately if it
 receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each
 house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.
 If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate
 effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *